Willoughby v. Hain Celestial Group
Plaintiff: Charlotte Willoughby
Defendant: Hain Celestial Group, Inc. and Hain Celestial Group doing business as Earth's Best Organics
Petitioner: Summer Apicella, Nicole Stewart and Elizabeth Agramonte
Case Number: 2:2021cv00970
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, from April 26, 2021 to June 25, 2021 by Hain Celestial Group. (Ross, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Ross on behalf of Hain Celestial Group (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases RESPONSE BY THE STEWART PLAINTIFFS TO THE ALBANO PLAINTIFFS UNTIMELY OBJECTIONS TO MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION AND TO SET DEADLINES filed by Elizabeth Agramonte, Summer Apicella, Nicole Stewart. (Liskow, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in 21cv1293 indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #13 , #14 : The Motions of Katherine Van Dyke and Charles J. LaDuca for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/23/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 Proposed Pretrial Order by Elizabeth Agramonte, Summer Apicella, Nicole Stewart (Pollack, Janine)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #15 Reply in Support by Elizabeth Agramonte, Summer Apicella, Nicole Stewart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Pollack, Janine)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY in Support re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Elizabeth Agramonte, Summer Apicella, Nicole Stewart. (Pollack, Janine)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14283091. by Charlotte Willoughby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles J. LaDuca, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (LaDuca, Charles)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14283035. by Charlotte Willoughby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Katherine Van Dyke, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Van Dyck, Katherine)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Charlotte Willoughby. (Peterson, Rebecca)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 : The motion of Robert K. Shelquist for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. If he has not already done so, Mr. Shelquist is directed to register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/5/2021. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14245535. by Charlotte Willoughby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Shelquist, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 : The motion of Rebecca A. Peterson for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted. If she hasn't already done so, the attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/4/2021. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in Civil Action Case No. 2:21-cv-01118 (JMA)(AKT) indicates that this case is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14237711. by Charlotte Willoughby. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing (CA; MN)) (Peterson, Rebecca)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charlotte Willoughby. Hain Celestial Group waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Hudson, Christian)
February 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Nicole Stewart, Elizabeth Agramonte, Summer Apicella. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Pollack, Janine)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hain Celestial Group. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates that Case Nos. 2:21cv00088 (DRH)(ST), 2:21cv00678 (JS)(AYS), 2:21cv00758 (JS)(SIL), 2:21cv00805 (SJF)(SIL) and 1:21cv00870 (DG)(SJB)are related cases. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Defendant Hain Celestial Group, Inc. and added Defendant Hain Celestial Group to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summons and Exhibits) and re-entered as against Defendant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Charlotte Willoughby (Hudson, Christian)
February 23, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. All questions in the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) have to be completed on page 2. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 22, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14183444 (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hain Celestial Group, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14183444 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Charlotte Willoughby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, Healthy Babies Bright Futures Report, #4 Exhibit 2, Test Results of Hain Celestial Foods, #5 Exhibit 3, Subcommittee on Economic and Consumer Policy, Committee on Oversight and Reform Report) (Hudson, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willoughby v. Hain Celestial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hain Celestial Group doing business as Earth's Best Organics
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Willoughby
Represented By: Christian Edward Hudson
Represented By: Joseph J. DePalma
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Katherine Van Dyck
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Summer Apicella
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicole Stewart
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elizabeth Agramonte
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?