The Federal Savings Bank v. Manafort et al
Plaintiff: The Federal Savings Bank
Defendant: John Doe 1 through John Doe 10, Kathleen B. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC, Paul J. Manafort and New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
Case Number: 2:2021cv01393
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2021 (FTR Log #11:06-11:10.) (Torres, Jasmine)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendants' motion seeking a second extension of time to respond to the Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, and Summerbreeze LLC time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED only through May 20, 2021.Further, the telephone status conference scheduled for May 19, 2021 is ADVANCED to May 12, 2021 at 11:00 AM. Counsel are directed to call the AT&T Teleconference Center at (877) 810-9415 at the time of the conference and enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/6/2021. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
May 5, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Thomas J. McGowan, Esq.'s letter to Judge Anne Y. Shields in response to the bad faith letter request filed on this date by the Manafort defendants for a second 30 day extension of time to respond to the commercial foreclosure complaint filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (McGowan, Thomas)
May 5, 2021 Filing 23 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC. (Perry, Rodney)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/19/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. The parties are directed to call the ATT teleconferencing center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (Torres, Jasmine)
May 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE regarding # Administrative Order No. 2021-08 In Re: Matter of Cases Previously Assigned to the Honorable Sandra J. Feuerstein. As set forth in Admin. Order No. 2021-08, the duty to respond to the order is mandatory. Each party must indicate their intent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office within thirty (30) days of the date of the order. In the case of a newly added party, such party has thirty days from the date of appearance in the case in which to return their election form. Election Forms are NOT to be filed via ECF. They are to be sent to the Clerk of Court via email to consent@nyed.uscourts.gov or via United States mail to: United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722.CF. They are to be sent to the Clerk of Court via email to consent@nyed.uscourts.gov or via United States mail to: United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. (Cubano, Jazmin)
April 12, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: The conference scheduled to be held before Judge Feuerstein on 5/17/2021 is adjourned without date. c/ECF (Ortiz, Grisel)
April 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Crowl on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Crowl, Matthew)
April 9, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14356507. by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew Crowl, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Crowl, Matthew)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/9/2021. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Perry on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Perry, Rodney)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14350659. by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rodney Perry, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Perry, Rodney)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/7/2021. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC. (Cekirge, Nafiz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nafiz Cekirge on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC (aty to be noticed) (Cekirge, Nafiz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney Denley on behalf of Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, Summerbreeze LLC (aty to be noticed) (Denley, Brittney)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, and Summerbreeze LLC time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 5/12/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/2/2021. (Mucciaccio, Dina)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Scheduling Order served on Kathleen B. Manafort on 03/22/2021, filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Scheduling Order served on Paul J. Manafort on 03/22/2021, filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Federal Savings Bank. Kathleen B. Manafort served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Federal Savings Bank. Paul J. Manafort served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for March 17, 2021 SCHEDULING ORDER served on SUMMERBREEZE, LLC on March 22, 2021, filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for March 17, 2021 SCHEDULING ORDER served on New York State Department of Taxation and Finance on March 16, 2021, filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Federal Savings Bank. Summerbreeze LLC served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Federal Savings Bank. New York State Department of Taxation & Finance served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (McGowan, Thomas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, New York State Department of Taxation & Finance, Summerbreeze LLC. (Cubano, Jazmin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by The Federal Savings Bank (Attachments: #1 KATHLEEN B. MANAFORT Proposed Summons, #2 SUMMERBREEZE, LLC Proposed Summons, #3 NYS DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE Proposed Summons) (McGowan, Thomas)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The caption on the summonses do not match the caption as it appears on the complaint. You may use "et al" and attach a rider. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Initial Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. At the designated time, the parties shall call Chambers' teleconferencing number, (877) 336-1280 , and follow the automated instructions; the access code is: 7215690 . Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 3/17/2021. c/ECF (Adell, April)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Federal Savings Bank (McGowan, Thomas)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe 1 through John Doe 10, Kathleen B. Manafort, Paul J. Manafort, New York State Department of Taxation & Finance, Summerbreeze LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14283214 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by The Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. A - Metes and bounds description, #3 Ex. B - Note, #4 Ex. C - Mortgage, #5 PAUL J. MANAFORT Proposed Summons, #6 KATHLEEN B. MANAFORT Proposed Summons, #7 SUMMERBREEZE, LLC Proposed Summons, #8 NYS DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE Proposed Summons) (McGowan, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Federal Savings Bank v. Manafort et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 through John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen B. Manafort
Represented By: Brittney Denley
Represented By: Matthew C. Crowl
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerbreeze LLC
Represented By: Brittney Denley
Represented By: Matthew C. Crowl
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Manafort
Represented By: Brittney Denley
Represented By: Matthew C. Crowl
Represented By: Nafiz Cekirge
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Thomas J. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?