Windward Bora, LLC v. Small et. al.
Plaintiff: Windward Bora, LLC
Defendant: Dawn Small, New York Department of Taxation and Finance, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency, Christopher Small, John T. Mather Memorial Hospital, People of the State of NY, Gregory J. Diehl MD PC, United States of America, Siomins Inc., Dawn F. Small, Dawn F. Reaves, Rocky Point Medical Care, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, People of the State of New York, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking and John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2021cv02566
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 33 Request for Certificate of Default by Windward Bora, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit EX A AOS, #3 Proposed Order) (Light, Danielle)
July 2, 2021 Filing 32 Request for Certificate of Default by Windward Bora, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit EX A AOS, #3 Proposed Order) (Light, Danielle)
July 2, 2021 Filing 31 Request for Certificate of Default by Windward Bora, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit EX A AOS, #3 Proposed Order) (Light, Danielle)
July 2, 2021 Filing 30 Request for Certificate of Default by Windward Bora, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit EX A AOS, #3 Proposed Order) (Light, Danielle)
July 2, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. United States of America served on 6/18/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. People of the State of New York served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. New York State Department of Taxation and Finance served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/5/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. Rocky Point Medical Care served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. Siomins Inc. served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. John T. Mather Memorial Hospital served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. Gregory J. Diehl MD PC served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 23, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. John Doe and Jane Doe served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 22, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. Dawn Small served on 6/12/2021, answer due 7/5/2021. (Light, Danielle)
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora, LLC. Christopher Small served on 6/12/2021, answer due 7/5/2021. (Light, Danielle)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with copies of the notices filed at ECF Nos. #14 and #15 in a manner consistent with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 90-day deadline to serve Defendants. Additionally, Plaintiff shall file proof of service of the notices on or before August 26, 2021. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 5/28/2021. (Brown, Melissa)
May 27, 2021 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit of Service by Windward Bora, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A Copy of RPAPL 1320, #2 Exhibit EX B Copy of RPAPL 1303) (Light, Danielle)
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Rider for Summons) (Valle, Christine)
May 13, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Rider) (Light, Danielle)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #14 & #15 Notices (Other) filed by Windward Bora, LLC. Plaintiff is directed to serve Defendants, who have not yet appeared in this action, with copies of their notices filed at ECF Nos. #14 and #15 , and file proof of service to the docket on or before May 27, 2021. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 5/13/2021. (Brown, Melissa)
May 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Windward Bora, LLC 1303 Notice (Light, Danielle)
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Windward Bora, LLC 1320 Notice (Light, Danielle)
May 12, 2021 Proposed Summons #4 - #11 were not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included; and the names on the summons do not match the names as they appear on the complaint. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Valle, Christine)
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Windward Bora, LLC (Light, Danielle)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 10, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Added missing Defendants Rocky Point Medical Care and John Doe and Jane Doe to the case. Deleted Defendants New York Department of Taxation and Finance, People of the State of NY and Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency and re-entered Defendants to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Windward Bora, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B-Note, #3 Exhibit C-Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D-30 Day Letter, #5 Exhibit E-90 Day Letter, #6 Exhibit F-Payoff Amount, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 5/10/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
May 7, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14450532 (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 5/10/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2021: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windward Bora, LLC v. Small et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windward Bora, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Paula Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Mather Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Diehl MD PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siomins Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn F. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn F. Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Point Medical Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?