Catapane v. Titan Motor Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: John E. Catapane
Defendant: Joseph Valentino, Titan Motor Group LLC doing business as Infiniti of Manhasset and Millennium Infiniti, Ltd. doing business as Infiniti of Manhasset
Case Number: 2:2021cv02632
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Dismissing Parties: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the above defendant. Party Titan Motor Group LLC terminated. So Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/28/2021. (Cubano, Jazmin)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John E. Catapane Only As to Titan Motor Group LLC (Lipsky, Douglas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Titan Motor Group LLC, Joseph Valentino, Millennium Infiniti, Ltd., filed by John E. Catapane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Stipulation) (Lipsky, Douglas)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John E. Catapane. Titan Motor Group LLC served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021; Joseph Valentino served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Joseph Valentino. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Titan Motor Group LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John E. Catapane (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by John E. Catapane (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by John E. Catapane (Lipsky, Douglas) (Main Document 2 replaced for statistical purposes (pdf flagged as corrupt) on 5/12/2021) (Florio, Lisa).
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Titan Motor Group LLC, Joseph Valentino filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14459545, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by John E. Catapane. (Lipsky, Douglas) Modified on 5/12/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catapane v. Titan Motor Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Catapane
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Represented By: Milana Dostanitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Motor Group LLC doing business as Infiniti of Manhasset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Infiniti, Ltd. doing business as Infiniti of Manhasset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?