Eckert v. Suffolk County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Andrew Eckert, Jr.
Defendant: Suffolk Count Sheriff, Erol Toulon and Suffolk County Riverhead Correctional Facility Medical Unit
Case Number: 2:2021cv02650
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
2 Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address from pro se Plaintiff. New Address: Kevin A. Eckert, Jr., #375435, Riverhead Correctional Facility, 110 Center Drive, Riverhead, NY 11901. (Docket Sheet updated). (Coleman, Laurie)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER dated 5/24/2021 from Pro Se Department to Kevin Eckert, Jr. The Court is in receipt of your letter dated May 19, 2021, in which you request that we provide you with a copy of the complaint filed in each of the above referenced actions. Please note that we have provided you with a copy of each as a one-time courtesy. Future copies of documents will be subject to the standard fee of fifty cents per page. (Coleman, Laurie)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER dated 5/19/2021 from Kevin A. Eckert, Jr. re Request for copies. (Coleman, Laurie)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. (Coleman, Laurie)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Plaintiff Eckert acknowledging receipt of civil action. Docket number and Judge(s) assigned provided to Plaintiff. All appropriate case opening documents included in mailing. CM 5/14/21. (Grady, Jessica)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Motion referred to James M. Wicks) (CM to pro se plaintiff) (Florio, Lisa)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Related Cases: 19-cv-6691-JMA-SIL and 21-cv-1297-JMA-SIL The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , and #1 Complaint. The papers are deficient as a Prisoner Authorization (PLRA) form is also required. Copy mailed on 5/10/2021 (Cox, Dwayne)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Andrew Eckert, Jr. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Kevin Andrew Eckert, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckert v. Suffolk County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Andrew Eckert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk Count Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erol Toulon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Riverhead Correctional Facility Medical Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?