Ammann v. Sharestates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Ammann
Defendant: Allen Shayanfekr and Sharestates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02766
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Steven Ammann by Allen Shayanfekr, Sharestates, Inc.. (Munoz, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Motion GRANTED. Sharestates, Inc. answer due 6/30/2021; Allen Shayanfekr answer due 6/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/27/2021. (Ryan, Mary)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Steven Ammann. (Pohl, David)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sharestates, Inc., Allen Shayanfekr. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Steven Ammann (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pohl, David)
May 18, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14478058 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Steven Ammann. (Pohl, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ammann v. Sharestates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ammann
Represented By: David Matthew Pohl
Represented By: Michael Todd Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Shayanfekr
Represented By: Michael McGee Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharestates, Inc.
Represented By: Michael McGee Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?