McMunn et al v. Quogue Village Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jason McMunn and Edwin MacDonald
Defendant: Quogue Village Police Department, Christopher B. Isola, Village of Quogue, Robert Coughlan and Christopher Isola
Case Number: 2:2021cv02805
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint until July 26, 2021 by Robert Coughlan, Christopher Isola, Quogue Village Police Department, Village of Quogue. (Miranda, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Robert Coughlan answer due 7/26/2021; Christopher Isola answer due 7/26/2021; Quogue Village Police Department answer due 7/26/2021; Village of Quogue answer due 7/26/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/4/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason McMunn, Edwin MacDonald. Robert Coughlan served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Bartels, Paul)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason McMunn, Edwin MacDonald. Christopher Isola served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Bartels, Paul)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason McMunn, Edwin MacDonald. Village of Quogue served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Bartels, Paul)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason McMunn, Edwin MacDonald. Quogue Village Police Department served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Bartels, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Vilage of Quogue, #2 Summons Christopher Isola, #3 Summons Robert Coughlan) (Rodin, Deanna)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Edwin MacDonald, Jason McMunn (Bartels, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Edwin MacDonald, Jason McMunn (Bartels, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Edwin MacDonald, Jason McMunn (Bartels, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Edwin MacDonald, Jason McMunn (Bartels, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Edwin MacDonald, Jason McMunn (Bartels, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced for statistical purposes (original pdf flagged as corrupt) on 5/19/2021) (Florio, Lisa).
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14483950 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jason McMunn, Edwin MacDonald. (Bartels, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMunn et al v. Quogue Village Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McMunn
Represented By: Paul Andrew Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin MacDonald
Represented By: Paul Andrew Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quogue Village Police Department
Represented By: Michael Anthony Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher B. Isola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Quogue
Represented By: Michael Anthony Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Coughlan
Represented By: Michael Anthony Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Isola
Represented By: Michael Anthony Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?