Molina v. James et al
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Molina
Respondent: John Doe-Federal Insurance Company/Chubb Group, Estate of Rosalind & Joseph Gurwin, Letitia James and Madeline Singas
Case Number: 2:2021cv03144
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02971. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 13, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Juan Carlos Molina at 1840 Cornelius Avenue, Wantagh, NY 11793. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/3/2021.]
April 12, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/3/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court also respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this action in this Court. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/12/2021) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/3/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Rosalind & Joseph Gurwin, Letitia James, John Doe-Federal Insurance Company/Chubb Group, Madeline Singas. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401277275)Document filed by Juan Carlos Molina. (Attachments: #1 Receipt).(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/3/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/3/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/3/2021.]
April 7, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Estate of Rosalind & Joseph Gurwin, Letitia James, Madeline Singas..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe-Federal Insurance Company/Chubb Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Estate of Rosalind & Joseph Gurwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Letitia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Madeline Singas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?