The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Rhodie et. al.
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Defendant: Inez Rhodie, John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5, Inez Brooks, James Dozier and Michael Rhodie
Case Number: 2:2021cv03165
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Michael Rhodie served on 7/21/2021, answer due 8/11/2021. (Manfredi, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. James Dozier served on 7/17/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Manfredi, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Inez Rhodie served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Manfredi, John)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
June 29, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to James Dozier, Inez Rhodie, Michael Rhodie. (Attachments: #1 Inez Rhodie, #2 Michael Rhodie) (Herrera, Isaiah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
June 15, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: Your Proposed Summons were not issued for the following reason: the date on the Proposed Summons is incorrect as it is added by the Clerk's Office as of the date of issuance. Please leave the date blank as instructed on 6/4/2021. (Tavarez, Jennifer) Modified on 6/15/2021 (Tavarez, Jennifer).
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Manfredi, John) Modified on 6/4/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Manfredi, John) Modified on 6/4/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Dozier, John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5, Inez Rhodie, Michael Rhodie Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 6/4/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 4, 2021 Your Proposed Summons was not issued for the following reasons: The section that reads "To: (Defendant's name and address)" has not been fully completed (Please include party text for the Defendants) and the date on the Proposed Summons is incorrect as it is added by the Clerk's Office as of the date of issuance. Please leave the date blank. Please correct and resubmit the Proposed Summons using the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 4, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Defendant JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5 and added John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5 to the case. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Exhibits) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Rhodie et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inez Rhodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-5 and Jane Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inez Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rhodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?