The City of New York et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: County of Broome, New York, County of Suffolk, New York, County of Schenectady, New York, County of Greene, New York, County of St. Lawrence, New York, County of Ontario, New York, County of Herkimer, New York, County of Columbia, New York, County of Seneca, New York, County of Orange, New York, The City of New York, County of Lewis, New York, County of Ulster, New York, County of Dutchess, New York, County of Sullivan, New York, County of Washington, New York, County of Montgomery, New York, County of Erie, New York, County of Monroe, New York, County of Fulton, New York, County of Wyoming, New York and County of Oswego, New York
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03283
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-05183, filed 07/06/2021. (Florio, Lisa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 3): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 7, 2021, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (Florio, Lisa)
June 28, 2021 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 3): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 7, 2021, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Florio, Lisa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD received from SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE for E-filed Supreme Court case, Index 610739/2021. (Valle, Christine)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further proceedings. Judge Rachel P. Kovner, Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/21/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and Exhibits, Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Civil Cover Sheet served on James Conroy, Simmons Hanly Conroy, LLC, 112 Madison Avenue, 7th Floor, New York, NY 10016 on June 11, 2021, filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States. (Bernard, James)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to the Clerk of Court re: Determination of Related Case by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Cheifetz, David)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Bernard, James)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (Bernard, James)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States from Supreme Court, Suffolk County, case number 610739/2021. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYEDC-14555532)Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Purdue Voluntary Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - City of NY - POC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Broome County - POC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Columbia County - POC, #6 Exhibit 6 - Dutchess County - POC, #7 Exhibit 7 - Erie County - POC, #8 Exhibit 8 - Fulton County - POC, #9 Exhibit 9 - Greene County - POC, #10 Exhibit 10 - Herkimer County - POC, #11 Exhibit 11 - Lawrence County - POC, #12 Exhibit 12 - Lewis County - POC, #13 Exhibit 13 - Monroe County - POC, #14 Exhibit 14 - Montgomery County - POC, #15 Exhibit 15 - Ontario County - POC, #16 Exhibit 16 - Orange County - POC, #17 Exhibit 17 - Oswego County - POC, #18 Exhibit 18 - Schenectady County - POC, #19 Exhibit 19 - Seneca County - POC, #20 Exhibit 20 - Suffolk County - POC, #21 Exhibit 21 - Sullivan County - POC, #22 Exhibit 22 - Ulster County - POC, #23 Exhibit 23 - Washington County - POC, #24 Exhibit 24 - Wyoming County - POC) (Bernard, James) Modified on 6/11/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of New York et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Broome, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Suffolk, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Schenectady, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Greene, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of St. Lawrence, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Ontario, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Herkimer, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Columbia, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Seneca, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Orange, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Lewis, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Ulster, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Dutchess, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Sullivan, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Washington, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Montgomery, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Erie, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Monroe, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Fulton, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Wyoming, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Oswego, New York
Represented By: Andrea Bierstein
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Thomas I. Sheridan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?