Reyes Reyes v. Kohlhepp et al
Plaintiff: Nelson Gregorio Reyes Reyes
Defendant: Fire Island Pines Property Owners Association, Inc., Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc., Pines Pantry and Don Kohlhepp
Case Number: 2:2021cv03430
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 Letter In Opposition to Remand by Fire Island Pines Property Owners Association, Inc. (Greenspan, Stewart)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 Letter for pre-motion conference by Nelson Gregorio Reyes Reyes (Pretter, David) Modified on 7/22/2021 to change from letter to motion (Coleman, Laurie).
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in Case No. 2:21-cv-03679 (DG)(ST) indicates that this civil action is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Pretter on behalf of Nelson Gregorio Reyes Reyes (notification declined or already on case) (Pretter, David)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
June 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fire Island Pines Property Owners Association, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 606993/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14577273) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mercante, James) Modified on 6/21/2021 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes Reyes v. Kohlhepp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Gregorio Reyes Reyes
Represented By: David J. Pretter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Island Pines Property Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Represented By: Stewart B. Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pines Hardwear and Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pines Pantry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?