Adams-Borden v. North Shore University Hospital
Plaintiff: Elaine Adams-Borden
Defendant: North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System and North Shore University Hospital
Case Number: 2:2021cv03466
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by North Shore University Hospital. (Sapp, Keegan)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #13 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement as moot; denying #14 as moot; denying #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO CHANGE THE NAME OF DEFENDANT FROM NORTH SHORE LONG ISLAND JEWISH HEALTH SYSTEM TO NORTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL as unnecessary. The complaint is deemed amended to substitute North Shore University Hospital as defendant in place of North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System, and the Clerk is directed to amend the docket sheet accordingly. No amended complaint is permitted based on this ministerial correction. **North Shore University Hospital added. North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System terminated. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/16/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
August 15, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO CHANGE THE NAME OF DEFENDANT FROM NORTH SHORE LONG ISLAND JEWISH HEALTH SYSTEM TO NORTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL by Elaine Adams-Borden. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
August 15, 2021 Filing 14 Letter MOTION to Withdraw #13 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO CHANGE THE NAME OF DEFENDANT FROM NORTH SHORE LONG ISLAND JEWISH HEALTH SYSTEM TO NORTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL In error, the incorrect document was uploaded to ECF by Elaine Adams-Borden. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
August 15, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO CHANGE THE NAME OF DEFENDANT FROM NORTH SHORE LONG ISLAND JEWISH HEALTH SYSTEM TO NORTH SHORE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL by Elaine Adams-Borden. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
August 5, 2021 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/5/2021. Counsel for both sides present by telephone. The NYCHRL claims are dismissed on consent. The Court also set the following discovery schedule: the parties shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 8/12/2021; serve written discovery requests by 8/26/2021; produce written discovery by 9/25/2021; and complete depositions by 11/24/2021, the date fact discovery ends. The last day for filing a letter requesting a pre-motion conference to file dispositive motions shall be 12/1/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 Letter in response to Court Order, dated August 2, 2021, Requesting a Supplemental Letter by North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #11 . Defendant's portion of the letter is wholly inadequate. Defendant does not provide any detail as to how it intends to address the substance of plaintiff's discrimination claims. Defendant is ordered to submit a supplemental letter describing the factual and legal bases for those defenses by 8/4/2021, or the Court will find that defendant has willfully failed to comply with this Court's Order for the Initial Status Conference and will impose an appropriate preclusion order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/2/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 Letter pursuant to Initial Status Conference by North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System (Attachments: #1 proposed case management plan) (Sapp, Keegan)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Keegan B. Sapp on behalf of North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System (aty to be noticed) (Sapp, Keegan)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a response to the Complaint by North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System. (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez on behalf of North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System (aty to be noticed) (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 . Defendant's time to answer is extended to 8/16/2021. However, the parties are advised that this Court does not wait for answers to be filed as they are not required in planning discovery set at the Initial Status Conference. Therefore that conference will proceed as scheduled for 8/5/2021. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/16/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Adams-Borden. North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Blackburn, Tyrone)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System. (Guzzi, Roseann)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Elaine Adams-Borden (Blackburn, Tyrone)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 8/5/2021 at 12:45 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 3466#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/22/2021. (Clarke, Melonie)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 6/22/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2021: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14581083 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Elaine Adams-Borden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blackburn, Tyrone) Modified on 6/22/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams-Borden v. North Shore University Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Adams-Borden
Represented By: Tyrone Anthony Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore Long Island Jewish Health System
Represented By: Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez
Represented By: Keegan B. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore University Hospital
Represented By: Keegan B. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?