DiOrio v. Cook Group, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Natina DiOrio
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc., Cook Medical LLC, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, William Cook Europe ApS and Cook Medical, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03885
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-157: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the order of October 15, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. (Florio, Lisa)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-157: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the order of October 15, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. (Florio, Lisa)
August 18, 2021 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:21-cv-06554, filed 08/18/2021. (Florio, Lisa)
August 18, 2021 Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Cook Medical, LLC F.K.A Cook Medical Incorporated, #2 Summons-Cook Incorporated, #3 Summons-William Cook Europe APS) (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 12, 2021 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted all Defendants and re-entered Defendants to conform to the caption on the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Natina DiOrio against Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe APS Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Natina DiOrio. (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 7/12/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
July 9, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14643480 (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Natina DiOrio (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Farnolo, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiOrio v. Cook Group, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natina DiOrio
Represented By: Nicholas Rocco Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe ApS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?