DeMaria v. Icon Burger Acquisition LLC
Plaintiff: Paul DeMaria and Joseph Rosario
Defendant: Icon Burger Acquisition LLC doing business as Smashburger
Case Number: 2:2021cv04313
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Icon Burger Acquisition LLC, filed by Joseph Rosario. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to the Complaint Icon Burger Acquisition LLC answer due 9/30/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/24/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Icon Burger Acquisition LLC. (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) Modified on 9/24/2021 to reflect correct filing event(Vasquez, Lea).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Capobianco on behalf of Icon Burger Acquisition LLC (aty to be noticed) (Capobianco, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter Consenting to Defendant's Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Paul DeMaria (Kopel, Yitzchak)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to the Complaint: Icon Burger Acquisition LLC answer due 9/23/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/23/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to the Complaint. The Court defers ruling on the application until Defendant can represent that it has obtained consent from Plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/23/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Icon Burger Acquisition LLC. (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) Modified on 8/23/2021 (Vasquez, Lea).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul DeMaria. Icon Burger Acquisition LLC served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Icon Burger Acquisition LLC. (Landow, Concetta)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Icon Burger Acquisition LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-14713231 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Paul DeMaria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kopel, Yitzchak) Modified on 8/2/2021 (Landow, Concetta).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMaria v. Icon Burger Acquisition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul DeMaria
Represented By: Alec Mitchell Leslie
Represented By: Yitzchak Kopel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rosario
Represented By: Yitzchak Kopel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Burger Acquisition LLC doing business as Smashburger
Represented By: Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?