West Coast 2014-7, LLC v. Chandipersaud et al
Plaintiff: West Coast 2014-7, LLC
Defendant: Rajkumarie Chandipersaud and KASA Lithuanian Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2021cv04314
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. KASA Lithuanian Federal Credit Union served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Rajkumarie Chandipersaud has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Rajkumarie Chandipersaud is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. Rajkumarie Chandipersaud served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rajkumarie Chandipersaud, KASA Lithuanian Federal Credit Union. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b and Section Nine-X of the Banking Law by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by West Coast 2014-7, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rajkumarie Chandipersaud, KASA Lithuanian Federal Credit Union filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14713275 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by West Coast 2014-7, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)
August 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 2, 2021 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Coast 2014-7, LLC v. Chandipersaud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast 2014-7, LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajkumarie Chandipersaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KASA Lithuanian Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?