New York Packaging II, LLC v. Intco Medical Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: New York Packaging II, LLC
Defendant: Intco Medical Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04388
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 Letter RESPONSE TO ATTORNEY ARONSON'S LETTER TO HON. GUJARATI by New York Packaging II, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Weissman, Edward)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #9 Amended Complaint /Letter Motion for a Pre-Motion Conference in advance of making a Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Intco Medical Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Comparison Initial Complaint v. Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Contracts, #3 Exhibit C - CIETAC Rules) (Aronson, Eric)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Intco Medical Industries, Inc., filed by New York Packaging II, LLC. (Weissman, Edward)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #7 Motion for Pre Motion Conference -- In light of Plaintiff's #8 Response Letter indicating an intent to amend its complaint, Defendant's request for a premotion conference is denied. Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is September 17, 2021. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint no later than October 8, 2021. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 8/24/2021. (Almonte, Kelly)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Letter to Hon. Gujarati in Response to Letter by Counsel for Defendant INTCO by New York Packaging II, LLC (Weissman, Edward)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in advance of making a Motion to Dismiss by Intco Medical Industries, Inc.. (Aronson, Eric)
August 10, 2021 Attention Eric S. Aronson: This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Kirchner, Mary)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intco Medical Industries, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Aronson, Eric)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intco Medical Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Intco Medical Technology Co., Ltd. for Intco Medical Industries, Inc.. (Aronson, Eric)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal by Intco Medical Industries, Inc. (Aronson, Eric)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Intco Medical Industries, Inc. from Supreme Court, Nassau County, case number 608297/2021. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYEDC-14724292) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint) (Aronson, Eric) Modified on 8/6/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Packaging II, LLC v. Intco Medical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Packaging II, LLC
Represented By: Edward Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intco Medical Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eric S. Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?