SynKloud Technologies, LLC et al v. Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC
Plaintiff: SynKloud Technologies, LLC and Serendia, LLC
Defendant: Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04423
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference via Zoom will be held at 10:00 AM on November 1, 2021 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than October 25, 2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Plan Worksheet, #2 JMW Individual Rules) (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasjit Vidwan on behalf of Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Vidwan, Jasjit)
September 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Taniel Ermano Anderson on behalf of Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Anderson, Taniel)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Motion of Taniel E. Anderson for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, with registration being available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/28/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Motion of Jasjit S. Vidwan for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, with registration being available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/28/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. The return date for Taniel E. Anderson's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 shall be on September 28, 2021. In accordance with this Court's Individual Practice Rules, any opposition must be filed by September 26, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/21/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. The return date for Jasjit S. Vidwan's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 shall be on September 28, 2021. In accordance with this Court's Individual Practice Rules, any opposition must be filed by September 26, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/21/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jasjit S. Vidwan Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14853351. by Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit of Jasjit S. Vidwan, #4 Proposed Order) (Vidwan, Jasjit)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Taniel E. Anderson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14853175. by Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit of Taniel E. Anderson, #4 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Taniel)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC (LaCava, Richard)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard LaCava on behalf of Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC (aty to be noticed) (LaCava, Richard)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint on behalf of Defendant Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC. Response to complaint now due on or before 10/15/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/9/2021. (Wicks, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, on behalf of Defendant Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC by Serendia, LLC, SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Kiddie, Jr on behalf of Serendia, LLC, SynKloud Technologies, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Kiddie, Robert)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Motion of Robert Kiddie for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, with registration being available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/28/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Kiddie Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14750972. (Corrected/Notarized Affidavit) by Serendia, LLC, SynKloud Technologies, LLC (Kiddie, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 by Robert Kiddie, is denied with leave to renew upon properly notarizing the Affidavit in Support. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/27/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC, Serendia, LLC. Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Kiddie, Robert)
August 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The return date for Robert Kiddie's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 shall be on August 20, 2021. In accordance with this Court's Individual Practice Rules, any opposition must be filed by August 18, 2021, at least two days prior to the return date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/14/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Kiddie Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14750972. by Serendia, LLC, SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Robert Kiddie) (Kiddie, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/10/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SynKloud Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ideahub, Inc. for SynKloud Technologies, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Corporate Disclosure Statement was filed as an attachment in docket entry 1. Document was saved and refiled as a separate entry. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $402, receipt number ANYEDC-14728446 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by SynKloud Technologies, LLC, Serendia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(a) Disclosure Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5) (DeRienzo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SynKloud Technologies, LLC et al v. Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SynKloud Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Michael DeRienzo
Represented By: Robert Kiddie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serendia, LLC
Represented By: Michael DeRienzo
Represented By: Robert Kiddie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cartessa Aesthetics, LLC
Represented By: Richard LaCava
Represented By: Jasjit Vidwan
Represented By: Taniel Ermano Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?