Smith v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Joan Smith
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv04617
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew B. Siben and Stephen G. Siben terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/13/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy)
September 12, 2021 Filing 12 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and so order consent to change attorney by Joan Smith. (Tanenbaum, Ted)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 STATE COURT RECORD received from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk including a Certified Copy of their Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #607866/2021, along with a copy of the Notice of Removal or 8019(c) with order. (Coleman, Laurie)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER. Local Rule 1.4 provides that "[a]n attorney who has appeared as attorney of record for a party may be relieved or displaced only by order of the Court" and that "[s]uch an order may be granted only upon a showing by affidavit or otherwise of satisfactory reasons for withdrawal or displacement and the posture of the case, including a position, if any, on the calendar, and whether or not the attorney is asserting a retaining or charging lien." The outgoing attorneys (Siben & Siben, LLP) have failed to provide any reason to justify withdrawal from this case. Accordingly, the Consent to Change Attorney is rejected with leave to re-file in compliance with the Local Rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/8/2021. (Weinstein, Tracy) Modified to correct a typographical error 9/8/2021 (Ortiz, Grisel).
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Substitute Attorney NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Ted J. Tanenbaum (Tanenbaum, Ted) Modified event type from Notice to Motion on 9/8/2021 (Ortiz, Grisel).
August 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted J. Tanenbaum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Tanenbaum, Ted)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference via Zoom will be held at 12:00 PM on November 17, 2021 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than November 10, 2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Plan Worksheet, #2 JMW Individual Rules) (Ortiz, Grisel)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation re #4 Notice of Appearance (Azzaretto, Mary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Azzaretto, Mary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Azzaretto on behalf of Target Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Azzaretto, Mary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sal F. DeLuca on behalf of Target Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (DeLuca, Sal)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Target Corporation (DeLuca, Sal)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 607866/2021. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14758476) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (DeLuca, Sal) Modified on 8/17/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
August 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Smith
Represented By: Andrew B. Siben
Represented By: Stephen G. Siben
Represented By: Ted J. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Sal F. DeLuca
Represented By: Mary C. Azzaretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?