Lew v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Lew
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and CVS Albany, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04772
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY in Support re #11 Reply in Opposition, #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Barbara Lew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patane Decision, #2 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service) (Day, Rose)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Status, #2 Exhibit Case Management Worksheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's letter) (Muhlstock, Gary)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for November 3, 2021 at 11:40 a.m. by telephone before the undersigned. The Court will initiate the conference call. The call in instructions are as follows: The parties are directed to dial (888) 684-8852 prior to the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 7625765. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/28/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order by CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Muhlstock, Gary)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Barbara Lew. (Attachments: #1 Attorneys Affirmation in Support, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Ex A Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex B Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Ex C Amended Complaint & Supplemental Summons, #6 Exhibit Ex D Answer, #7 Exhibit Ex E Court Order, #8 Exhibit Ex F Dept. of State Printout, #9 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service on Defendants) (Day, Rose)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD Received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office re: Notice of Removal Index #6153358/2021. (Galeano, Sonia)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by CVS Albany, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Muhlstock, Gary)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by September 30, 2021. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) form) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Barbara Lew. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Summons) (Day, Rose)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate CVS Albany, L.L.C. and Other Affiliate CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Muhlstock, Gary) Modified on 8/24/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 615358/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14779340). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Muhlstock, Gary) Modified on 8/24/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).
August 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lew v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lew
Represented By: Rose M. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Gary P. Muhlstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Albany, L.L.C.
Represented By: Gary P. Muhlstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?