Greenhaus et al v. Gersh et al
Plaintiff: Ellynn Greenhaus, Laurie Gersh and West Hills Day Camp, Inc.
Defendant: Kevin Gersh
Case Number: 2:2021cv04849
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 Letter in response to Defendants' pre-motion conference request by Laurie Gersh, Ellynn Greenhaus (Gewirtz, Edward)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellynn Greenhaus, Laurie Gersh. West Hills Day Camp, Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Gewirtz, Edward)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 . On consent, Plaintiffs are GRANTED an extension of time to file a response to Defendants' pre-motion conference request. Plaintiffs shall file a response on or before October 6, 2021. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/24/2021. (Brown, Melissa)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Letter by Laurie Gersh, Ellynn Greenhaus. (Gewirtz, Edward)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Harfenist on behalf of Kevin Gersh, West Hills Day Camp, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Harfenist, Steven)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 Letter Request for Pre Motion Conference by Kevin Gersh, West Hills Day Camp, Inc. (Harfenist, Steven)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellynn Greenhaus, Laurie Gersh. West Hills Day Camp, Inc. served on 9/6/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Gewirtz, Edward)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellynn Greenhaus, Laurie Gersh. Kevin Gersh served on 9/6/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Gewirtz, Edward)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/8/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to West Hills Day Camp, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kevin Gersh. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Laurie Gersh, Ellynn Greenhaus, West Hills Day Camp, Inc. (Gewirtz, Edward)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Laurie Gersh, Ellynn Greenhaus, West Hills Day Camp, Inc. (Gewirtz, Edward)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Laurie Gersh, Ellynn Greenhaus, West Hills Day Camp, Inc. (Gewirtz, Edward)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $402, receipt number BNYEDC-14790843, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Ellynn Greenhaus, Laurie Gersh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Board Minutes Appointing Directors, #2 Exhibit B - Forensic Report) (Gewirtz, Edward) Modified on 8/30/2021 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenhaus et al v. Gersh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellynn Greenhaus
Represented By: Edward N. Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Gersh
Represented By: Edward N. Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Hills Day Camp, Inc.
Represented By: Edward N. Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Gersh
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?