Display Technologies, LLC v. Nikon Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Display Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Nikon Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04904
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Tirado, Chelsea)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/7/2021. (Tirado, Chelsea)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Display Technologies, LLC (Johnson, Jay)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nikon Americas, Inc. (Florio, Lisa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Display Technologies, LLC (Johnson, Jay)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
September 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14799787. by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Johnson, Jay)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Display Technologies, LLC REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK (Johnson, Jay)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Display Technologies, LLC (Johnson, Jay)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nikon Americas, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14799424 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Display Technologies, LLC v. Nikon Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Display Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikon Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?