Gonzalez v. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc.
Plaintiff: Noe Gonzalez
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc. doing business as The Cheesecake Factory
Case Number: 2:2021cv05017
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc.. (Stecker, Stephen)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #7 , Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended, nunc pro tunc, to and including 11/9/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 10/14/2021. (Reilly, Megan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc.. (Stecker, Stephen)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Stecker on behalf of The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Stecker, Stephen)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anjanette Cabrera on behalf of The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cabrera, Anjanette)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc.. (Landow, Concetta)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14816952 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Noe Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Moser, Steven) Modified on 9/8/2021 (Landow, Concetta).
September 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Gonzalez
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cheesecake Factory Restaurant, Inc. doing business as The Cheesecake Factory
Represented By: Anjanette Cabrera
Represented By: Stephen Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?