Meyer et al v. The Green Vale School et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Meyer and Jenn Meyer
Defendant: The Green Vale School, Christopher Garcia and Jesse Dougherty
Case Number: 2:2021cv05180
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 Letter in Compliance with Conference Directives by Jenn Meyer, Trevor Meyer (Esagoff, Janet)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Esagoff with Jenn Meyer and Trevor Meyer; Radi for Defendants. The First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney #9 is granted. Plaintiffs' counsel are directed to file a letter on ECF containing the complete contact information for Plaintiffs so that the docket can reflect their pro se status. Once the letter is filed, Janet Esagoff and Rebecca Sassouri will be terminated as attorneys of record and the Plaintiffs shall be designated as pro se. Parties are discussing settlement and will advise the Court if a settlement conference would be helpful. Pro Se Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's Letter Motion for a pretrial conference by November 23, 2021. (FTR Log #AT&T 10:30 - 10:45.) (Vasquez, Lea)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order In accordance with this Court's rulings issued during today's conference, Attorneys Janet N. Esagoff and Rebecca Sassouni are terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court shall update the docket sheet to include plaintiffs' contact information provided in counsel's letter, docket entry #12 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/26/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #9 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Esagoff Law Group, PC Proof of Service via Email Acknowledgement filed by Jenn Meyer, Trevor Meyer. (Esagoff, Janet)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Esagoff Law Group, PC by Jenn Meyer, Trevor Meyer. (Esagoff, Janet)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. A motion hearing will be held by phone before the undersigned at 10:30 a.m. on October 26, 2021. Counsel for all parties and the plaintiff clients must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. Plaintiffs' counsel shall immediately forward a copy of this Order to their clients via return receipt delivery and file proof of delivery with the Court. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/19/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/12/2021. (Walsh, Catherine)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Letter Application by Jenn Meyer, Trevor Meyer. (Esagoff, Janet)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall file a response by 10/12/21. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/5/2021. (Walsh, Catherine)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Letter Application by Jenn Meyer, Trevor Meyer. (Esagoff, Janet)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet N. Esagoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Esagoff, Janet)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Jesse Dougherty, Christopher Garcia, The Green Vale School. (Radi, Mark)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
September 21, 2021 Rebecca Sassouni; This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Landow, Concetta)
September 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Jesse Dougherty, Christopher Garcia, The Green Vale School (Radi, Mark)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jesse Dougherty, Christopher Garcia, The Green Vale School from Nassau County Supreme Court, case number 611455/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14848744) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Radi, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer et al v. The Green Vale School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Meyer
Represented By: Janet N. Esagoff
Represented By: Rebecca Sassouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenn Meyer
Represented By: Janet N. Esagoff
Represented By: Rebecca Sassouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Green Vale School
Represented By: Mark A. Radi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Garcia
Represented By: Mark A. Radi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Dougherty
Represented By: Mark A. Radi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?