Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC et. al. v. NTI-NY, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC, Josephine Herrschaft and Anthony Herrschaft
Defendant: NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc., James Gleich, John Kindt, Amy Wills, Rich Nolan and Marc A Jacobi
Case Number: 2:2021cv05396
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft, Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC as to John Kindt. (Honecker, Rodman)
November 19, 2021 Filing 23 Letter Request for Pre-Motion Conference by James Gleich, Marc A Jacobi, John Kindt, NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc. (Keane, Timothy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft, Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC. Marc A Jacobi served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Honecker, Rodman)
November 16, 2021 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft, Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC as to Rich Nolan. (Honecker, Rodman)
November 12, 2021 Filing 20 Letter Request for a Pre-Motion Conference by James Gleich, Marc A Jacobi, John Kindt, NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc. (Keane, Timothy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in Support further support of remand motion filed by Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC, Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Memorandum in Support, #6 Certificate of Service) (Honecker, Rodman)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 Letter to Honorable Denis Hurley by James Gleich, Marc A Jacobi, John Kindt, NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc., Rich Nolan, Amy Wills (Keane, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Keane, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #18 Letter filed by Rich Nolan, NTI-NY, Inc., James Gleich, National Transportation, Inc., Amy Wills, John Kindt, Marc A Jacobi : The application to accept the late filing is granted. In view of the late filing, plaintiffs are granted one additional day to file their reply. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/4/2021. (Gapinski, Michele)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Declaration of Marc A. Jacobi filed by All Defendants. (Keane, Timothy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Affidavit of Amy Wills filed by All Defendants. (Keane, Timothy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, #2 Exhibit Josephine Herrschaft Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Anthony Herrschaft Affidavit) (Keane, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC, Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Declaration, #7 Exhibit, #8 Memorandum in Support, #9 Declaration) (Honecker, Rodman)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC, Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft (Honecker, Rodman)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Marc A Jacobi, Rich Nolan, Amy Wills. (Cubano, Jazmin)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference via Zoom will be held at 10:30 am on 12/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than 12/15/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Worksheet, #2 JMW Individual Rules) (Sanders, Scott)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by James Gleich, John Kindt, NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc.. (Keane, Timothy)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC, Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft (Honecker, Rodman)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause: The Court declines to sign the proposed Order to Show Cause as presented. Among other things there is a question as to whether the Court has subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity and briefing on that subject, i.e. whether this matter should be remanded to state court, is appropriate. Accordingly, Plaintiffs shall serve and file moving papers in support of remand on or before October 22, 2201; defendants shall serve and file opposing papers on or before November 3, 2021; plaintiff shall serve and file reply papers, if any, on or before November 8, 2021. The parties shall address, inter alia, (1) the citizenship of NTI-NY; (2) whether NTI-NY should be realigned as a plaintiff for purposes of diversity; and (3) whether Amy Wills was added to destroy diversity. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/13/2021. (Gapinski, Michele)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Extend TRO entered in State Court, to Remand or for alternative relief Letter to Judge filed by James Gleich, NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 06/26/21 Letter from Baylis to Gleich, #2 Exhibit 07/06/21 Letter from Pantaleo to Baylis, #3 Exhibit 08/02/21 Letter from Pantaleo to Baylis, #4 Exhibit 08/09/21 Letter from Fink to Pantaleo, #5 Exhibit 09/01/21 Letter from Pantaleo to Fink, #6 Exhibit 09/30/21 Letter from Honecker to Keant, #7 Exhibit 10/06/21 Letter from Keane to Honecker, #8 Exhibit 10/08/21 Letter from Honecker to Keane) (Keane, Timothy)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #6 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Extend TRO entered in State Court, to Remand or for alternative relief filed by Josephine Herrschaft : A courtesy copy of the motion papers must be provided. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/8/2021. (Gapinski, Michele)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Extend TRO entered in State Court, to Remand or for alternative relief by Josephine Herrschaft. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit, #6 Declaration, #7 Exhibit EXH A VERIFIED COMPLAINT, #8 Exhibit EXH B ORDER, #9 Exhibit EXH C CORRESPONDENCE, #10 Exhibit EXH D EMAIL, #11 Exhibit EXH E CORRESPONDENCE, #12 Exhibit EXH F AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT, #13 Exhibit EXH G VERIFIED COMPLAINT, #14 Declaration) (Honecker, Rodman)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC, Anthony Herrschaft, Josephine Herrschaft. (Honecker, Rodman)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James Gleich, NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Transportation, Inc. for NTI-NY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Seidman, Debra)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Gleich, NTI-NY, Inc., National Transportation, Inc. from Nassau County Supreme Court, case number 611118/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14882766) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit Declaration of James Gleich, #5 Exhibit Declaration of John Kindt, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on NTI-NY, Inc., #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Service of National Transportation, Inc., #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on James Gleich, #9 Affidavit of Service) (Seidman, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC et. al. v. NTI-NY, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Coast Transportation Service LLC
Represented By: Rodman E. Honecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Herrschaft
Represented By: Rodman E. Honecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Herrschaft
Represented By: Rodman E. Honecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTI-NY, Inc.
Represented By: Debra E. Seidman
Represented By: Timothy J. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Debra E. Seidman
Represented By: Timothy J. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gleich
Represented By: Debra E. Seidman
Represented By: Timothy J. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kindt
Represented By: Timothy J. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?