Rivera v. The County of Suffolk et al
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Rivera
Defendant: The County of Suffolk, Department of Social Services of the County of Suffolk, Annette Mahoney-Cross, Traci Barnes, John P. Lomascolo, Maureen Peterson, Jodi Tomlinson, Linda Gargano, Mark Clavin and Frances Pierre
Case Number: 2:2021cv05439
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Summons Issued, #9 Summons Issued, #11 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, #6 Summons Issued, #12 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued, #5 Summons Issued, #8 Summons Issued, #7 . The time for Defendant County of Suffolk to respond to the waiver request is extended to December 20th and the time to answer the complaint is extended to January 19, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/20/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Summons Issued, #9 Summons Issued, #11 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, #6 Summons Issued, #12 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued, #5 Summons Issued, #8 Summons Issued, #7 Summons Issued, #13 Summons Issued by The County of Suffolk. (Rogers, Jennean)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Corsini, Alexander)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Corsini, Alexander)
October 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Frances Pierre. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Mark Clavin. (Corsini, Alexander) Modified on 10/5/2021 (Corsini, Alexander).
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Linda Gargano. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jodi Tomlinson. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Maureen Peterson. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to John P. Lomascolo. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Traci Barnes. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Annette Mahoney-Cross. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Department of Social Services of the County of Suffolk. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The County of Suffolk. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Traci Barnes, Mark Clavin, Department of Social Services of the County of Suffolk, Linda Gargano, John P. Lomascolo, Annette Mahoney-Cross, Maureen Peterson, Frances Pierre, The County of Suffolk, Jodi Tomlinson filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNYEDC-14889848 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Carlos J. Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons) (Barbieri, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. The County of Suffolk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Rivera
Represented By: Laura D. Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Suffolk
Represented By: Jennean R. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Social Services of the County of Suffolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Mahoney-Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Lomascolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Clavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?