Goldstein v. Eisai, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca G. Goldstein
Defendant: Eisai, Inc. and Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv05445
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 2/9/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 2/1/2022. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Plaintiff is directed to deliver a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file proof of service on the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/5/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/8/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Jakubowski, Laura)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Eisai, Inc.. (Jakubowski, Laura)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Jakubowski, Laura).
October 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Rebecca G. Goldstein (Kunkle, Tate)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Rebecca G. Goldstein (Kunkle, Tate)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Rebecca G. Goldstein (Kunkle, Tate)
October 1, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (SECOND PAGE IS BLANK). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page must be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14890831 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Rebecca G. Goldstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kunkle, Tate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein v. Eisai, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca G. Goldstein
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisai, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?