Olsen v. South Huntington Union Free School District et. al.
Plaintiff: Danielle Olsen
Defendant: South Huntington Union Free School District and Sheila Bushe
Case Number: 2:2021cv05464
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re [9, 10]: The Court waives its requirement for a pre-motion conference and sets the following briefing schedule for the proposed motion to dismiss: defendants shall serve, but not file, moving papers, on or before November 22, 2021; plaintiff shall serve, but not file, opposing papers on or before December 20, 2021; defendants shall serve reply papers, if any, and file all papers with the Court, including a courtesy copy for Chambers, on or before January 7, 2022.Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/1/2021. (Gapinski, Michele)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Letter Letter in Response for Pre Motion Conference to Dismiss the Complaint by Danielle Olsen (Ansari, Ramsha)
October 12, 2021 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #9 MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss the complaint filed by Sheila Bushe, South Huntington Union Free School District. The document should have been filed as a LETTER application and the Court will address the document as such. All corrections will be made by the clerks office. (Florio, Lisa)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Letter application for pre motion to dismiss the complaint by Sheila Bushe, South Huntington Union Free School District. (Kleinberg, Adam) Modified docket text on 10/13/2021 (Florio, Lisa).
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam I. Kleinberg on behalf of Sheila Bushe, South Huntington Union Free School District (aty to be noticed) (Kleinberg, Adam)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sheila Bushe, South Huntington Union Free School District. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Sheila Bushe) (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Danielle Olsen (Ansari, Ramsha)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Danielle Olsen (Ansari, Ramsha)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Danielle Olsen (Ansari, Ramsha)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14895174 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Danielle Olsen. (Ansari, Ramsha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsen v. South Huntington Union Free School District et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Olsen
Represented By: Ramsha Ansari
Represented By: John C Luke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Huntington Union Free School District
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Bushe
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?