Rubio et al v. Leefam Cleaning, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Rubio and Maria Machado
Defendant: Leefam Cleaning, Inc. doing business as Nu-Clear Cleaners and Wilson Lee
Case Number: 2:2021cv05515
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wilson Lee, Leefam Cleaning, Inc., filed by Claudia Rubio, Maria Machado. (Avshalumov, Roman)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Claudia Rubio, Maria Machado. Wilson Lee waiver sent on 11/3/2021, answer due 1/2/2022; Leefam Cleaning, Inc. waiver sent on 11/3/2021, answer due 1/2/2022. (Avshalumov, Roman)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Milman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Milman, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Brown on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Maria Machado, Claudia Rubio (aty to be noticed) (O'Donnell, James)
November 1, 2021 Case Reassigned randomly to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Morabito, Bryan)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Landow, Concetta)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
October 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Maria Machado, Claudia Rubio (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Maria Machado, Claudia Rubio (Avshalumov, Roman)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wilson Lee, Leefam Cleaning, Inc. d/b/a Nu-Clear Cleaners filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14902619 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Claudia Rubio, Maria Machado. (Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubio et al v. Leefam Cleaning, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Rubio
Represented By: Roman M. Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Machado
Represented By: Roman M. Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leefam Cleaning, Inc. doing business as Nu-Clear Cleaners
Represented By: Matthew A Brown
Represented By: Robert F. Milman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Lee
Represented By: Matthew A Brown
Represented By: Robert F. Milman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?