Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran and Terrie Killoran
Defendant: Westhampton Beach School District, Michael Radday, Suzanne Mensch, Joyce Donneson, Geroge Kast, Halsey Stevens and George Kast
Case Number: 2:2021cv05924
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joyce Donneson, George Kast, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Radday, Halsey Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District of Answer to Complaint (Leahey, Anne)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Leahey, Anne)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Pro Se Office to Plaintiffs CK and TK acknowledging receipt of the civil action and providing the case number and Judge(s) assigned. All appropriate case opening letters provided with filing. CM 11/15/21. (Grady, Jessica)
October 30, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joyce Donneson, Geroge Kast, Suzanne Mensch, Michael Radday, Halsey Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District of Notice of Appearance (Leahey, Anne)
October 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne C. Leahey on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leahey, Anne)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-00866-GRB-SIL, 17-cv-03553-ADS-SIL, 18-cv-03389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-02418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-03298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-05078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-06663-JS-SIL, 20-cv-00269-JS-SIL, 20-cv-04121-JS-SIL, 20-cv-04763-JS-SIL, 21-cv-01281-JS-SIL and 21-cv-03264-JS-SIL The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 29, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 31767 (Cox, Dwayne)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran, Christian Killoran(on behalf of his son Aiden Killoran). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhampton Beach School District
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Radday
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Mensch
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Donneson
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geroge Kast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsey Stevens
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kast
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?