Gigante v. Misonix Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Joseph Gigante
Defendant: Misonix Inc., Stavros Vizirgianikis, Sharon Klugewicz, Joseph Dwyer, Stacy Miller, Allan Staley, Misonix Inc. Now Known As Bioventus, Inc. doing business as Misonix, Sharon Wargo and Stacy Strattman
Case Number: 2:2021cv06004
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan R Novich on behalf of Joseph Dwyer, Sharon Klugewicz, Stacy Miller, Misonix Inc., Allan Staley, Stavros Vizirgianikis (aty to be noticed) (Novich, Ivan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Misonix Inc. waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Cohen, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Stavros Vizirgianikis waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Cohen, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Stacy Miller waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Cohen, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Allan Staley waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Cohen, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Joseph Dwyer waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Cohen, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Sharon Klugewicz waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Cohen, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Capobianco on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Capobianco, Matthew)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Misonix Inc. served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Cohen, Robert)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Sharon Klugewicz served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Cohen, Robert)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Gigante. Stavros Vizirgianikis served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Cohen, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates that Case No. 2:21-cv-01970 (JS)(AKT) is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14978490 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Joseph Gigante. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Cohen, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gigante v. Misonix Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gigante
Represented By: Robert Cohen
Represented By: Daniele D. De Voe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misonix Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stavros Vizirgianikis
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Klugewicz
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dwyer
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Miller
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Staley
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misonix Inc. Now Known As Bioventus, Inc. doing business as Misonix
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Wargo
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Strattman
Represented By: Ivan R Novich
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?