Hickory IP LLC v. Casio America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hickory IP LLC
Defendant: Casio America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv06053
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
2 Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hickory IP LLC (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respondto the Complaint is extended to and including 1/6/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/1/2021. (Pincsak, Lydia)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hickory IP LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hickory IP LLC. Casio America, Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy Chong on behalf of Hickory IP LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Chong, Jimmy)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/18/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #6 : The Motion of Jimmy Chong for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/18/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15037913. by Hickory IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Chong, Jimmy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Casio America, Inc.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 11/2/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2021: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
November 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Casio America, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14984053 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by Hickory IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1: US Pat. No. 7,476,016, #4 Exhibit 2: Claim Chart) (Loaknauth, Nicholas) Modified on 11/2/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickory IP LLC v. Casio America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hickory IP LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Loaknauth
Represented By: Jimmy Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casio America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?