Henriquez v. Century Carriers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Francisco Caballero Henriquez
Defendant: Century Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv06205
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Elizabeth Mietus on behalf of Century Carriers, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mietus, Danielle)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Century Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation) (Patel, Jasmine)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Century Carriers, Inc. answer due 1/14/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/15/2021. (Vasquez, Lea)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Caballero Henriquez. Century Carriers, Inc. served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Romero, Peter)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Donald Barnhorn on behalf of Francisco Caballero Henriquez (aty to be noticed) (Barnhorn, David)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Century Carriers, Inc.. (Landow, Concetta)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
November 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Century Carriers, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15011218 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Francisco Caballero Henriquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Romero, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henriquez v. Century Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Caballero Henriquez
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Represented By: David Donald Barnhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Elizabeth Mietus
Represented By: Jasmine Y. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?