Sam Tell and Son, Inc. v. Doyle
Plaintiff: Sam Tell and Son, Inc.
Defendant: Brian Doyle and Brian F. Doyle
Case Number: 2:2021cv06876
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received from Suffolk County Clerk. (Florio, Lisa)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re: #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; The Clerk's Office is directed to mark this case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/22/2021. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sam Tell and Son, Inc. (Lang, Andrew)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
December 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian Doyle re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, and Doyle Declaration (Kulak, Marjorie)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian Doyle from New York State Supreme Court, Suffolk County, case number 620851/2021. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15111435) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Doyle Declaration) (Kulak, Marjorie) Modified on 12/14/2021 (Jakubowski, Laura).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sam Tell and Son, Inc. v. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Tell and Son, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Doyle
Represented By: Marjorie Beth Kulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian F. Doyle
Represented By: Marjorie Beth Kulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?