Conroy v. Commack Union Free School District et al
Plaintiff: Denis Conroy
Defendant: Commack Union Free School District, Patrick Friel and Leslie Boritz
Case Number: 2:2021cv07018
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Leslie Boritz, Commack Union Free School District, Patrick Friel. (Campbell, Mallory)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Denis Conroy. All Defendants. (McManus, Diana)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Marie McManus on behalf of Denis Conroy (aty to be noticed) (McManus, Diana)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
December 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15132876 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Denis Conroy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Commack UFSD, #3 Proposed Summons Friel, #4 Proposed Summons Boritz) (Zabell, Saul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conroy v. Commack Union Free School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Conroy
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Represented By: Diana Marie McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commack Union Free School District
Represented By: Mallory Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Friel
Represented By: Mallory Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Boritz
Represented By: Mallory Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?