Thrivent Financial for Lutherans et. al. v. Bos et. al.
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans and Thrivent Investment Management, Inc.
Defendant: Martha Bos, Diana Bos Daniels and Michelle Musinski
Case Number: 2:2022cv00054
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) - Now, therefore, it is on this 24th day of February 2022; ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Deposit Sum of Money with the Court into the Court Registry Investment System Liquidity Fund (CRIS Liquidity Fund) shall be, and is hereby GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that Thrivent shall pay to the Clerk of Court $258,307.35 for deposit into the Court Registry Investment System, it is FURTHER ORDERED that such sum, to wit; $258,307.35, be deposited by the Clerk of Court into the Registry of this Court and then, as soon as the business of his or her office allows, the Clerk of court shall deposit these funds into the interest-bearing CRIS Liquidity Fund administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts as Custodian, pursuant to L. Civ. R. 67.1(a)(2)... SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/24/2022. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) on Consent by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Investment Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion) (Lesko, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: A settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Locke is scheduled for 3/21/2022 at 2:00 p.m. via the AT&T tele-conference center. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. The parties are reminded that, at least 24 hours prior to the conference, each party shall provide the Court with an ex parte settlement position letter no longer than three pages in length addressing the facts as each party understands them, any case law the parties want to bring to the Court's attention, the history of settlement negotiations, and a realistic assessment of the party's settlement position. The settlement statements, which will be kept confidential and not docketed, should be e-mailed to my Courtroom Deputy at kristin_gandiosi@nyed.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/4/2022. (Pincsak, Lydia)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: This matter is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference at the earliest convenience of the Court. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/3/2022. c/ecf (Cowan, Timothy)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Diana Bos Daniels. Diana Bos Daniels waiver sent on 1/6/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Rothenberg, Bruce)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Rothenberg on behalf of Diana Bos Daniels, Michelle Musinski (aty to be noticed) (Rothenberg, Bruce)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michelle Musinski. Michelle Musinski waiver sent on 1/6/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Rothenberg, Bruce)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 6, 2022 Incorrect Document Entry Information. The Corporate Disclosure Statement was filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The Corporate Disclosure Statement was re-entered as Docket Entry No. 3 utilizing the correct event. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 6, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Investment Management, Inc. (Flanagan, Doreen)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Investment Management, Inc. (Lesko, Robert)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER RELIEF against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15166175 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Investment Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration R. 7.1 Disclosure) (Lesko, Robert)
January 5, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Specifically, Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans et. al. v. Bos et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Represented By: Robert P. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thrivent Investment Management, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Bos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Bos Daniels
Represented By: Bruce A. Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Musinski
Represented By: Bruce A. Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?