Guru Teg Holding, Inc. v. Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Guru Teg Holding, Inc.
Defendant: Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc., Statewide Management Holding, Inc., Sajid Sohail, Manpreet Singh and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2022cv01375
Filed: March 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Denis R Hurley
2 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #19 Letter filed by Guru Teg Holding, Inc.. A video preliminary injunction hearing is set for 5/16/2022 at 2:00 p.m.. A video link will be emailed to the parties of record.Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/10/2022. (McMorrow, Karen)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/5/2022. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 4, 2022 Filing 20 Letter in Response to Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Sajid Sohail, John Does 1-5, Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc., Manpreet Singh, Statewide Management Holding, Inc. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
April 27, 2022 Filing 19 Letter request for a pre-motion conference to seek leave to move for a preliminary injunction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65 by Guru Teg Holding, Inc. (Broder, Robert)
April 20, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
April 20, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sajid Sohail, Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc., Manpreet Singh, Statewide Management Holding, Inc. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Wengrovsky, Todd)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #15 : The time for Sajid Sohail; Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc.; Manpreet Singh and Statewide Management Holding, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including April 20, 2022.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/14/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, stipulation extending time to respond to the complaint by Sajid Sohail, Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc., Manpreet Singh, Statewide Management Holding, Inc.. (Cassell, Michael)
April 12, 2022 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Sajid Sohail, Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc., Manpreet Singh, and Statewide Management Holding, Inc., have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Sajid Sohail, Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc., Manpreet Singh, and Statewide Management Holding, Inc., are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Certificate of Default by Guru Teg Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Support of Request for Default, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default) (Broder, Robert)
April 12, 2022 REQUEST for Certificate of Default #13 is denied at this time at to defendants John Does 1-5. The plaintiff has not filed a Summons Returned Executed to establish service of these defendants. (Toritto, Jim)
March 21, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guru Teg Holding, Inc.. Statewide Management Holding, Inc. served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Broder, Robert)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guru Teg Holding, Inc.. Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc. served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Broder, Robert)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guru Teg Holding, Inc.. Sajid Sohail served on 3/18/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. (Broder, Robert)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guru Teg Holding, Inc.. Manpreet Singh served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. (Broder, Robert)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guru Teg Holding, Inc. (Broder, Robert)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sajid Sohail, Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc., Manpreet Singh, Statewide Management Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3, #3 Summons #4) (Landow, Concetta)
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint/Exhibits) (Landow, Concetta)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
March 14, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Guru Teg Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to Defendant Statewide Management Holding, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons to Defendant Sajid Sohail, #3 Proposed Summons to Defendant Manpreet Singh) (Broder, Robert)
March 12, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Guru Teg Holding, Inc. (Broder, Robert)
March 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guru Teg Holding, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15371248 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Guru Teg Holding, Inc.. (Broder, Robert) Modified on 3/14/2022 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guru Teg Holding, Inc. v. Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guru Teg Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Scott Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maharaja Farmers Market, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Cassell
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statewide Management Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Cassell
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sajid Sohail
Represented By: Michael D. Cassell
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpreet Singh
Represented By: Michael D. Cassell
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?