United States of America v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Linda B. Phillips, Robert S. Phillips, County Of Suffolk, New York, J.S. Funding Corporation, Commissioner of the New York Department of Taxation and Finance, SW Anderson Sales Co., Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency, Town of Smithtown Receiver of Taxes and Calvary SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02564
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 19 Cavalry SPV I, LLC as Assignee of Citibank, N.A. Stipulation and Disclaimer of Interest in 434 Meadow Road, Kings Park, New York 11754 as a response or ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Shapiro, Alan)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held on July 21, 2022, at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than July 14, 2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 6/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order, #2 JMW Individual Rules) (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer [DE 17] Defendant Suffolk County's time within which to respond to the complaint is hereby extended to and including July 8, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 6/9/2022. (Wicks, James)
June 8, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency, County Of Suffolk, New York. (Rogers, Jennean)
June 8, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Massucci on behalf of Town of Smithtown Receiver of Taxes (notification declined or already on case) (Massucci, Maria)
June 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig V. Rizzo on behalf of Town of Smithtown Receiver of Taxes (aty to be noticed) (Rizzo, Craig)
June 8, 2022 Filing 14 Town of Smithtown ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Town of Smithtown Receiver of Taxes. (Massucci, Maria)
June 1, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Calvary SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Shapiro, Alan)
June 1, 2022 Filing 12 Linda B. Phillps' and Robert S. Phillps' Acknowledgment of Service of Summons and Complaint and Stipulation Regarding Enforcement of Federal Tax Liens on 434 Meadow Road, Kings Park, New York 11754 as an ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Shapiro, Alan)
May 31, 2022 Filing 11 JS Funding Corporation's Acknowledgment of Service of Summons and Complaint and Disclaimer of Interest in 434 Meadow Road, Kings Park, New York 11754 as an ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America. (Shapiro, Alan)
May 27, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Town of Smithtown Receiver of Taxes served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Shapiro, Alan)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Shapiro, Alan)
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. County Of Suffolk, New York served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Shapiro, Alan)
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by SW Anderson Sales Co. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (Shapiro, Alan)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. New York Department of Taxation and Finance served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (Shapiro, Alan)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons NOTICE by United States of America re Quality Control Check - Summons, (Shapiro, Alan) Modified on 5/5/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons) (Shapiro, Alan) Modified on 5/5/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
May 5, 2022 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: The caption on each summons does not match the caption of the complaint; please include the full caption or if you use "et al" you must attach a rider; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect caption. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 5, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alan Martin Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda B. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Suffolk, New York
Represented By: Jennean R. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.S. Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the New York Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SW Anderson Sales Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency
Represented By: Jennean R. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Smithtown Receiver of Taxes
Represented By: Craig V. Rizzo
Represented By: Maria Massucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvary SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?