Rothman v. Complete Packaging & Shipping Supplies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yonah Rothman
Defendant: Complete Packaging & Shipping Supplies, Inc. and Mitchell Mankosa
Case Number: 2:2022cv02821
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yonah Rothman. Complete Packaging & Shipping Supplies, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/16/2022; Mitchell Mankosa waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (McManus, Diana)
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Dana Youngwirth on behalf of Complete Packaging & Shipping Supplies, Inc., Mitchell Mankosa (aty to be noticed) (Youngwirth, Brooke)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL; The undersigned hereby recuses herself from this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 (a) and it is requested that the Clerk of the Court reassign this matter to a randomly selected Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/17/2022. (Valle, Christine)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15565866 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yonah Rothman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Zabell, Saul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothman v. Complete Packaging & Shipping Supplies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonah Rothman
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Represented By: Diana Marie McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Packaging & Shipping Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke Dana Youngwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Mankosa
Represented By: Brooke Dana Youngwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?