Shafranek v. Mid Island Therapy Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yvonne Shafranek
Defendant: Mid Island Therapy Associates, LLC doing business as All About Kids, All About Kids, SLP, PLLC, Cathy Grosssfeld and Michael Grossfeld
Case Number: 2:2022cv02837
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yvonne Shafranek. Mid Island Therapy Associates, LLC waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
June 3, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yvonne Shafranek. Michael Grossfeld waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yvonne Shafranek. Cathy Grosssfeld waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yvonne Shafranek. All About Kids, SLP, PLLC waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
June 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Moreland on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Moreland, Daniel)
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Paul Pischl on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pischl, Stephen)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 11:30 AM in Telephone before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. The parties are directed to call the AT&TTeleconferencing Center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See order and attachments. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS RULES, #2 Joint Letter Requirements) (Torres, Jasmine)
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 DECLARATION HPSean Dweck by Yvonne Shafranek (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dunn & Bradstreet Printout, #2 Exhibit Resolution and related documents from Nassau County Interim Finance Authority Approving $10 million dollar contract, #3 Exhibit Audit Report from NYS Comptroller) (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All About Kids, SLP, PLLC, Michael Grossfeld, Cathy Grosssfeld, Mid Island Therapy Associates, LLC. (Tirado, Chelsea)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff has failed to allege that the defendant constitutes "an enterprise with annual sales exceeding $500,000, as is required for relief under the FLSA. See 29 U.S.C. 203(s)(1)(A)(ii)." Quito v. Zheng, 710 F. App'x 28, 29 (2d Cir. 2018). Plaintiff is directed to provide a submission regarding whether it has a good faith basis to believe whether it can satisfy this element of the statute. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/17/2022. c/ecf (Cowan, Timothy)
May 16, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Yvonne Shafranek (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2022: #1 Additional Corrections) (Jakubowski, Laura).
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Yvonne Shafranek (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Yvonne Shafranek (Dweck, H.P. Sean)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yvonne Shafranek. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Deleted Defendant Cathy Grossfeld and added Defendant Cathy Grosssfeld to the case to conform to the Caption on the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reason: The caption on the summons does not match the caption as it appears on the complaint. Specifically, the spelling for defendant Cathy Grossfeld doesn't match the Complaint and defendant Michael Grossfeld is missing. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
May 16, 2022 FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15568448 (Jakubowski, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafranek v. Mid Island Therapy Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Shafranek
Represented By: H.P. Sean Dweck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid Island Therapy Associates, LLC doing business as All About Kids
Represented By: Daniel C. Moreland
Represented By: Stephen Paul Pischl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All About Kids, SLP, PLLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Moreland
Represented By: Stephen Paul Pischl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Grosssfeld
Represented By: Daniel C. Moreland
Represented By: Stephen Paul Pischl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grossfeld
Represented By: Daniel C. Moreland
Represented By: Stephen Paul Pischl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?