Mauch v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Mauch
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc., P. White Holdings, LLC, Patrick J. White, Mike Todd, Sean Klein, Christopher M. Paradise and David Schmidt
Case Number: 2:2022cv04180
Filed: July 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stephen E. Mauch. (Walsh, Kenneth)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court having been advised that this matter has settled (ECF No. #23 ), the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 90 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents or stipulations of dismissal if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/23/2022. (Patterson, Samuel)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue. Defendant White is given a 15-day extension to September 23, 2022 in order to retain counsel and respond to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/8/2022. (Patterson, Samuel)
September 7, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Continue /Request for a 60 day extension to hire an attorney Letter of William A. Thomas, Esq. filed by Stephen E. Mauch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B--photo) (Thomas, William)
September 7, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. P. White Holdings, LLC served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Baxter, Jason)
September 7, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. Patrick J. White served on 8/12/2022, answer due 9/2/2022. (Baxter, Jason)
September 7, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. Austin Lloyd, Inc. served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Baxter, Jason)
September 1, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Continue /Request for a 60 day extension to hire an attorney by Stephen E. Mauch. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 29, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to David Schmidt. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 29, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Sean Klein. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 29, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Mike Todd. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 29, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to P. White Holdings, LLC. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 29, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Patrick J. White. (Coleman, Laurie) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/29/2022) (Coleman, Laurie).
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Christopher M. Paradise. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Austin Lloyd, Inc.. (Coleman, Laurie)
July 28, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 18, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15755196 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Stephen E. Mauch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thomas, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauch v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Mauch
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Represented By: William Allinson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. White Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?