Duncan v. County of Nassau et al
Plaintiff: Andre Duncan
Defendant: County of Nassau, Nassau County Sheriff's Department, Nassau County Correctional Center, Nassau County Sheriff James Dzurenda, Correction Officer Wilderman #3171, Correction Officer J Does #1-10 and Correction Officer John Does #1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv04264
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: County of Nassau answer due 10/26/2022; Nassau County Sheriff James Dzurenda answer due 10/26/2022; Correction Officer John Does #1-10 answer due 10/26/2022; Nassau County Correctional Center answer due 10/26/2022; Nassau County Sheriff's Department answer due 10/26/2022; Correction Officer Wilderman #3171 answer due 10/26/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/29/2022. (Minerva, Deanna)
August 26, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by County of Nassau, Nassau County Sheriff James Dzurenda, Nassau County Correctional Center, Nassau County Sheriff's Department, Correction Officer Wilderman #3171. (Reissman, Ralph)
August 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph J. Reissman on behalf of County of Nassau, Nassau County Sheriff James Dzurenda, Nassau County Correctional Center, Nassau County Sheriff's Department, Correction Officer Wilderman #3171 (aty to be noticed) (Reissman, Ralph)
August 9, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Duncan. Correction Officer John Does #1-10 served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Fernandez, Pablo)
August 9, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Duncan. Correction Officer Wilderman #3171 served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Fernandez, Pablo)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Duncan. Nassau County Sheriff James Dzurenda served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Fernandez, Pablo)
August 9, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Duncan. Nassau County Correctional Center served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Fernandez, Pablo)
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Duncan. Nassau County Sheriff's Department served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Fernandez, Pablo)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Duncan. County of Nassau served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (Fernandez, Pablo)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/21/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the AT&TTeleconferencing Center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules) (Torres, Jasmine)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 21, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 21, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Nassau, Correction Officer John Does #1-10, Nassau County Sheriff James Dzurenda, Nassau County Correctional Center, Nassau County Sheriff's Department, Correction Officer Wilderman #3171 filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15768036 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Andre Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons with Rider) (Fernandez, Pablo) Modified on 7/21/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. County of Nassau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Duncan
Represented By: Pablo A. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Nassau
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Correctional Center
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Sheriff James Dzurenda
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Wilderman #3171
Represented By: Ralph J. Reissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer J Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?