Pollner v. Tri-State Tournaments, LLC
Counter Defendant: Edward Pollner
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Tri-State Tournaments, LLC
Interpleader: John Saia, Bryan Ruck and Brian Dennison
Case Number: 2:2022cv05623
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Brian Dennison, Bryan Ruck, John Saia. (JC)
November 16, 2022 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 16, 2022 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 16, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 16, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: Counsel is to file the AO 440 Rev 6/12 SUMMONS FORM instead of a THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS, with an attached rider including the full caption of the case. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (GO)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by December 19, 2022. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) form) c/ecf (RI)
November 10, 2022 Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on each summons does not match the caption of the Third Party Complaint; specifically, you must attach a rider; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (JC)
November 10, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 10, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC (Fritz, Kevin)
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, INTERPLEADER, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John Saia, Bryan Ruck, Brian Dennison, COUNTERCLAIM against Edward Pollner by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC. (Fritz, Kevin)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until November 11, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/14/2022. (BJ)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tri-State Tournaments, LLC. (Fritz, Kevin)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tri-State Tournaments, LLC. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 21, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tri-State Tournaments, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15958616 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Edward Pollner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Chadha, Priya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollner v. Tri-State Tournaments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Edward Pollner
Represented By: Priya Chadha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Tri-State Tournaments, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: John Saia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Bryan Ruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Brian Dennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?