Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association et al v. County of Suffolk et al
Plaintiff: Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association and Noel DiGerolamo
Defendant: County of Suffolk, The Suffolk County Board of Ethics, Eric A. Kopp, Robert Trotta and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2022cv05803
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Lee G Dunst
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst will hold the initial conference on 1/17/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 830 of the U.S. District Court E.D.N.Y. Long Island Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, and submit a joint Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 1/9/2023 pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 11/18/2022. (CB)
November 17, 2022 Filing 23 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re - motion to dismiss by Eric A. Kopp, The Suffolk County Board of Ethics. (Kleinberg, Adam)
November 17, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by County of Suffolk. (Flynn, Susan)
November 16, 2022 Filing 21 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for defendant Robert Trotta by County of Suffolk. (Flynn, Susan)
November 16, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by County of Suffolk. (Flynn, Susan)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/16/2022. (SP)
October 31, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Ella Weisbord on behalf of Eric A. Kopp, The Suffolk County Board of Ethics (aty to be noticed) (Weisbord, Chelsea)
October 30, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam I. Kleinberg on behalf of Eric A. Kopp, The Suffolk County Board of Ethics (aty to be noticed) (Kleinberg, Adam)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/18/2022. (SP)
October 17, 2022 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Summons Issued with consent to November 17, 2022 by County of Suffolk. (Flynn, Susan)
October 4, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Noel DiGerolamo. (McQuade, Stephen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Noel DiGerolamo. (McQuade, Stephen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Noel DiGerolamo. Robert Trotta served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (McQuade, Stephen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Noel DiGerolamo. Eric A. Kopp served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (McQuade, Stephen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Noel DiGerolamo. The Suffolk County Board of Ethics served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (McQuade, Stephen)
October 4, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Noel DiGerolamo. County of Suffolk served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. (McQuade, Stephen) Modified on 10/4/2022 to correct service and answer dates (LC).
September 29, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Noel DiGerolamo, Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association (McQuade, Stephen)
September 29, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to County of Suffolk, Eric A. Kopp, The Suffolk County Board of Ethics, Robert Trotta. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 29, 2022 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 29, 2022 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Noel DiGerolamo, Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association (McQuade, Stephen)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Noel DiGerolamo, Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association (McQuade, Stephen) Modified on 9/29/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Noel DiGerolamo, Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association (McQuade, Stephen) Modified on 9/29/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Noel DiGerolamo, Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association (McQuade, Stephen) Modified on 9/29/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Noel DiGerolamo, Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association (McQuade, Stephen) Modified on 9/29/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura).
September 29, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 29, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. A fully completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - specifically page 2 of the document needs to be completed including the the NY-E Division of Business Rule 1(c) section of the document. Counsel is directed to submit the corrected Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Noel DiGerolamo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advisory Opinion, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 28, 2022 FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15985637 (Jakubowski, Laura)
September 28, 2022 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was entered as against plaintiffs; entry was deleted and re-entered as against defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association et al v. County of Suffolk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association
Represented By: Barry N. Saltzman
Represented By: Stephen McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel DiGerolamo
Represented By: Barry N. Saltzman
Represented By: Stephen McQuade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Suffolk
Represented By: Susan A. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Suffolk County Board of Ethics
Represented By: Chelsea Ella Weisbord
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Kopp
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: Chelsea Ella Weisbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Trotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?