Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Melgar, P.T. et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Hector Melgar, P.T., Hector Melgar, PT, P.C. doing business as Excelso Physical Therapy doing business as Trimotion Physical Therapy doing business as Brentwood Physical Rehabilitation, David Tubens, D.C., Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C., Front St. Chiropractic, P.C., Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Maxim Tyorkin, M.D. doing business as Maximum Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine, Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Pavilion Medical, P.C., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C. doing business as Advanced Spine Care doing business as Total Spine & Sports Care, William B. Jones, M.D., Phoenix Medical Services, P.C. doing business as Rockville Centre Pain Management & Rehabilitation, Richard Seldes, M.D., Deer Park Orthopedics, P.C., Station Medical Services, P.C., Randall Ehrlich, M.D. doing business as Orthocare Surgical, Ella Matatov, L.Ac., East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Diana Abramchayeva, L.Ac., DA Acupuncture, P.C., Maittes Romero, L.Ac., Ponce Acupuncture, P.C., Island Regional Management, LLC, Ella Matatov, L.AC, Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC and Maittes Romero, L.AC
Case Number: 2:2022cv07634
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. Party East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C., Front St. Chiropractic, P.C., Hector Melgar, PT, P.C., Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Island Regional Management, LLC, William B. Jones, M.D., Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Hector Melgar, P.T., Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Pavilion Medical, P.C., Phoenix Medical Services, P.C., Ponce Acupuncture, P.C., Maittes Romero, L.AC, David Tubens, D.C., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C. and Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C. terminated. Signed by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/16/2023. (DG)
November 7, 2023 Filing 72 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants, Hector Melgar, P.T., Hector Melgar, PT, P.C. d/b/a Excelso Physical Therapy, Trimotion Physical Therapy, and Brentwood Physical Rehabilitation, David Tubens, D.C., Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C., Front St. Chiropractic, P.C., Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Pavilion Medical, P.C., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C. d/b/a Advanced Spine Care and Total Spine & Sports Care, William B. Jones, M.D., Phoenix Medical Services, P.C. d/b/a Rockville Centre Pain Management & Rehabilitation, Ella Matatov, L.Ac., East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Maittes Romero, L.Ac., Ponce Acupuncture, P.C., and Island Regional Management, LLC only by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Brady, Hugh)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the status conference previously scheduled for 11/15/2023 is adjourned to 12/7/2023 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to that date, the conference will be canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 10/10/2023. (JM)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: Based on the representations regarding settlement in DE #71 , the status conference previously scheduled for 10/3/2023 is adjourned to 11/15/2023 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/28/2023. (JM)
September 27, 2023 Filing 71 Letter to Magistrate Judge Locke re Settlement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Sullivan, Shauna)
June 28, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to one Defendant, Randall Ehrlich dba Orthocare Surgical (Brady, Hugh)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; see attached. Next Status Conference set for 10/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/30/2023. (KG)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 5/30/2023. The court has adopted and So Ordered the joint proposed scheduling order #66 submitted by the parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/30/2023. (KG)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has received the parties' #69 request for an extension of time to finalize the settlement between the plaintiffs and defendant Ehrlich. All deadlines applicable to defendant Ehrlich are stayed. The plaintiffs and defendant Ehrlich are directed to file a stipulation of voluntary dismissal or a joint status report by June 28, 2023. If the parties are not able to resolve the case, the parties are directed to include a proposed briefing schedule in the status report. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 5/30/2023. (KA)
May 26, 2023 Filing 67 Letter to the Honorable Judge Donnelley by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Brady, Hugh)
May 26, 2023 Filing 66 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Brady, Hugh)
May 24, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company as to Richard Seldes, M.D., Deer Park Orthopedics, P.C., and Station Medical Services, P.C. (Sullivan, Shauna)
April 28, 2023 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Maxim Tyorkin, M.D.. (Vozza, David)
April 28, 2023 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC, DA Acupuncture, P.C.. (Vozza, David)
April 28, 2023 Filing 62 Letter to Judge Donnelly regarding report of settlement, in principle, between Plaintiffs and one Defendant, Randall Ehrlich dba Orthocare Surgical. These parties anticipate filing a stipulation of voluntary dismissal within 30 days. by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Brady, Hugh)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has received the parties' #62 letter informing the Court of a settlement in principle between the plaintiffs and defendant Ehrlich. All deadlines applicable to defendant Ehrlich are stayed. The plaintiffs and defendant Ehrlich are directed to file a stipulation of voluntary dismissal or a joint status report by May 29, 2023. If the parties are not able to resolve the case, the parties are directed to include a proposed briefing schedule in the status report. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 4/28/2023. (KA)
April 18, 2023 Filing 61 Joint Stipulation Between Allstate And The Defendants, Hector Melgar, P.T., Hector Melgar, Pt, P.C., David Tubens, D.C., Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C., East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C., Front St. Chiropractic, P.C., Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C., William B. Jones, M.D., Phoenix Medical Services, P.C., Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Pavilion Medical, P.C., Ella Matatov, L.Ac, East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Maittes Romero, L.Ac, And Ponce Acupuncture, P.C. To Stay Current And Future Arbitration Proceedings And State Court Litigation. Signed by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 4/18/2023. (DG)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #53 Motion for Preliminary Injunction in light of the parties' #59 stipulation and the plaintiffs' #60 letter clarifying that they seek to terminate the motion for preliminary injunction at this time. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 4/18/2023. (KA)
April 17, 2023 Filing 60 Letter to the Honorable Judge Anne Donnelly regarding the status of Allstate's Motion for Preliminary Injunction relative to Defendants not otherwise a Party to the Stipulation at ECF No. 59 by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Brady, Hugh)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER The Court has received #59 Stipulation regarding Scheduling Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Stipulation binds some but not all of the defendants. The plaintiffs are instructed to inform the Court, by April 17, 2023, if they intend to proceed with their motion for a preliminary injunction against the defendants not listed in the stipulation and, if so, to propose a modified briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 4/12/2023. (KA)
April 10, 2023 Filing 59 STIPULATION re Scheduling Order, #53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to stay Defendants' pending arbitrations and future arbitrations and state court litigation by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Brady, Hugh)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/30/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 SIL Individual Rules, #2 Scheduling Order Worksheet) (KG)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #57 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant Randall Ehrlich, M.D. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 4/28/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/5/2023. (JM)
April 4, 2023 Filing 57 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, as to Randall Ehrlich, M.D. d/b/a Orthocare Surgical by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer; DE #56 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC., DA Acupuncture, P.C., and Maxim Tyorkin, M.D., to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended, nunc pro tunc, to and including 4/28/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/3/2023. (JM)
March 31, 2023 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, (Stipulated) by Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC, DA Acupuncture, P.C.. (Vozza, David)
March 31, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, (Stipulated) by Maxim Tyorkin, M.D.. (Vozza, David)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has received #54 the parties' proposed briefing schedule. The defendants are directed to file their opposition by April 10, 2023; the plaintiffs must file a reply, if any, by April 17, 2023. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 3/21/2023. (KA)
March 20, 2023 Filing 54 Letter regarding proposed briefing schedule as to Allstate's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Sullivan, Shauna)
March 16, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to stay Defendants' pending arbitrations and future arbitrations and state court litigation by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit A to Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit B to Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum) (Brady, Hugh)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has received the plaintiffs' #53 motion to stay. Parties are directed to provide a proposed briefing schedule for this motion no later than March 20, 2023. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 3/16/2023. (KA)
March 15, 2023 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint by William B. Jones, M.D., Phoenix Medical Services, P.C.. (Lundgren, Kurt)
March 10, 2023 REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time as to Defendants Pavilion Medical, P.C., and Timothy Mosomillo, D.O. It appears from the docket that Defendants have appeared and filed an Answer. re #45 Request for Certificate of Default, #44 Request for Certificate of Default, (JP)
March 8, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Lundgren on behalf of William B. Jones, M.D., Phoenix Medical Services, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Lundgren, Kurt)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, DE #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC., DA Acupuncture, P.C., Maxim Tyorkin, M.D., to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 3/31/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/8/2023. (JM)
March 7, 2023 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C., East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C., Front St. Chiropractic, P.C., Hector Melgar, PT, P.C., Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Island Regional Management, LLC, Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Ella Matatov, L.AC, Hector Melgar, P.T., Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Pavilion Medical, P.C., Ponce Acupuncture, P.C., Maittes Romero, L.AC, David Tubens, D.C.. (Lundgren, Kurt)
March 7, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC, DA Acupuncture, P.C.. (Vozza, David)
March 7, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Maxim Tyorkin, M.D.. (Vozza, David)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER re DE #47 : On consent, the deadline for Defendants Timothy Mosomillo, P.O. and Pavilion Medical, P.C. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 3/11/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/6/2023. (JM)
March 3, 2023 Filing 47 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Pavilion Medical, P.C. (Lundgren, Kurt)
March 3, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Lundgren on behalf of Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Pavilion Medical, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Lundgren, Kurt)
February 28, 2023 Filing 45 Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 28, 2023 Filing 44 Request for Certificate of Default by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant East Point Acupuncture, P.C. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 3/11/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/22/2023. (JM)
February 17, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by East Point Acupuncture, P.C.. (Lundgren, Kurt)
February 16, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Lundgren on behalf of Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C., East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C., Front St. Chiropractic, P.C., Hector Melgar, PT, P.C., Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Island Regional Management, LLC, Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Ella Matatov, L.AC, Hector Melgar, P.T., Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Ponce Acupuncture, P.C., Maittes Romero, L.AC, David Tubens, D.C. (aty to be noticed) (Lundgren, Kurt)
February 14, 2023 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Richard Seldes, M.D. served on 2/7/2023, answer due 2/28/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 10, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Maxim Tyorkin, M.D.. (Vozza, David)
February 10, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC, DA Acupuncture, P.C.. (Vozza, David)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER The Court has received the defendants' #39 and #40 stipulations extending the time to answer the complaint. The Court construes the stipulations as consent motions for extension of time. The motions are granted. Defendants Maxim Tyorkin, M.D., Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC, and DA Acupuncture, P.C. are directed to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 9, 2023. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/10/2023. (KA)
February 9, 2023 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Randall Ehrlich, M.D. waiver sent on 2/9/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 9, 2023 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Ella Matatov, L.AC waiver sent on 2/7/2023, answer due 4/10/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 8, 2023 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Maxim Tyorkin, M.D. served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/20/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 6, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David N. Vozza on behalf of Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC, DA Acupuncture, P.C., Maxim Tyorkin, M.D. (aty to be noticed) (Vozza, David)
February 2, 2023 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. William B. Jones, M.D. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Ponce Acupuncture, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Phoenix Medical Services, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Maittes Romero, L.AC waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Island Regional Management, LLC waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Hector Melgar, PT, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Hector Melgar, P.T. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Front St. Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. David Tubens, D.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C. waiver sent on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C. waiver sent on 1/30/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
February 2, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Alexios Apazidis, M.D. waiver sent on 1/30/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 30, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Timothy Mosomillo, D.O. served on 1/26/2023, answer due 2/16/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 30, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC served on 1/25/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 24, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Station Medical Services, P.C. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 24, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Pavilion Medical, P.C. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 24, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. East Point Acupuncture, P.C. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 24, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Deer Park Orthopedics, P.C. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 24, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. DA Acupuncture, P.C. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Sullivan, Shauna)
December 16, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (CL)
December 16, 2022 Filing 9 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T. Apjohn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Apjohn, Andrew)
December 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh Brady on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Brady, Hugh)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna L Sullivan on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Shauna)
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan)
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (King, Richard)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diana Abramchayeva, L.Ac., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C., Alexios Apazidis, M.D., Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C., DA Acupuncture, P.C., Deer Park Orthopedics, P.C., East Point Acupuncture, P.C., Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C., Randall Ehrlich, M.D., Front St. Chiropractic, P.C., Hector Melgar, PT, P.C., Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Island Regional Management, LLC, William B. Jones, M.D., Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Ella Matatov, L.Ac., Hector Melgar, P.T., Timothy Mosomillo, D.O., Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C., Pavilion Medical, P.C., Phoenix Medical Services, P.C., Ponce Acupuncture, P.C., Maittes Romero, L.Ac., Richard Seldes, M.D., Station Medical Services, P.C., David Tubens, D.C., Maxim Tyorkin, M.D. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16233463 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46) (King, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Melgar, P.T. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew T. Apjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew T. Apjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew T. Apjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Andrew T. Apjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Melgar, P.T.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Melgar, PT, P.C. doing business as Excelso Physical Therapy doing business as Trimotion Physical Therapy doing business as Brentwood Physical Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tubens, D.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Regional Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Suffolk Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front St. Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hempstead Regional Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Regional Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patchogue Regional Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxim Tyorkin, M.D. doing business as Maximum Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine
Represented By: David N. Vozza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Mosomillo, D.O.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavilion Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexios Apazidis, M.D.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexios Apazidis, M.D., P.C. doing business as Advanced Spine Care doing business as Total Spine & Sports Care
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Jones, M.D.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Medical Services, P.C. doing business as Rockville Centre Pain Management & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Seldes, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deer Park Orthopedics, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Station Medical Services, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Ehrlich, M.D. doing business as Orthocare Surgical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Matatov, L.Ac.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Point Acupuncture, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Abramchayeva, L.Ac.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DA Acupuncture, P.C.
Represented By: David N. Vozza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maittes Romero, L.Ac.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponce Acupuncture, P.C.
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Regional Management, LLC
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Matatov, L.AC
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Abramchayeva, L.AC
Represented By: David N. Vozza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maittes Romero, L.AC
Represented By: Kurt E. Lundgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?