David J. Weissberg, MD et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: David J. Weissberg, M.D. P.C. doing business as Long Island Orthopedic Solutions, David J. Weissberg, M.D., David J. Weissberg, MD and David J. Weissberg, MD, P.C. doing business as Long Island Orthopedic Solutions
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00575
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: Due to a conflict, the Pre Motion Hearing set for April 11, 2023, has been MOVED TO April 5, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6B South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The parties shall appear by telephone. The parties shall dial into the conference by calling 1-888-684-8852 and entering the following access code: 1312089. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/20/2023. (SW).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Rule 26 Meeting Report shall be filed by April 25, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/10/2023. (BJ)
March 9, 2023 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Report by David J. Weissberg, MD, P.C., David J. Weissberg, MD. (Harfenist, Steven)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Pre Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, April 11, 2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B South before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The parties shall appear by telephone. The parties shall dial into the conference by calling 1-888-684-8852 and entering the following access code: 1312089. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/2/2023. (ML)
February 22, 2023 Filing 13 STATE COURT RECORD. (JT)
February 13, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for pre motion conference relative to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by David J. Weissberg, MD, P.C., David J. Weissberg, MD. (Harfenist, Steven)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by March 10, 2023. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(f) form) c/ecf (RI)
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for pre motion conference relative to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tilden, Nathan)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David J. Weissberg, MD, P.C., David J. Weissberg, MD (Lader, Jake)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gary R. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto for all further proceedings. So Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/27/2023. (GO)
January 27, 2023 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (LJ)
January 27, 2023 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
January 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh Brady on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Brady, Hugh)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (King, Richard)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Shauna)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Suffolk County Supreme Court, case number 208600/2022. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16346816) (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Sullivan, Shauna) Modified on 1/27/2023 (LJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David J. Weissberg, MD et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Weissberg, M.D. P.C. doing business as Long Island Orthopedic Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Weissberg, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Weissberg, MD
Represented By: Jake Lader
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Weissberg, MD, P.C. doing business as Long Island Orthopedic Solutions
Represented By: Jake Lader
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Shauna L Sullivan
Represented By: Hugh Brady
Represented By: Nathan A. Tilden
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?