Empire Community Development, LLC v. Larsen et al
Plaintiff: Empire Community Development, LLC
Defendant: Kimberly A. Larsen, Brian K. Larsen, Kimberly A. Kaiser-Larsen and Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency
Case Number: 2:2023cv05896
Filed: August 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191 Bank Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Community Development, LLC. Kimberly A. Larsen served on 8/26/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an Initial Conference on 11/14/2023 at 10:15AM via Zoom. The Court will email a Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, and submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order at least five business days prior to the initial conference pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. This Zoom conference will be a public proceeding; nonparties are welcome to attend via telephone. To receive a telephone invitation, nonparties may contact Judge Dunst's Chambers at (631) 712-5760. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 9/5/2023. (CT)
September 1, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency. (Rogers, Jennean)
August 30, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Community Development, LLC. Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (LJ)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
August 4, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Empire Community Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
August 3, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b and Section Nine-X of the Banking Law by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 3, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Empire Community Development, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian K. Larsen, Kimberly A. Larsen, Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16957960 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Empire Community Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit G, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empire Community Development, LLC v. Larsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A. Kaiser-Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency
Represented By: Jennean R. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire Community Development, LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?