Zapata et al v. Ipswich House, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maria Zapata and Edward Vincent Hommel
Defendant: Ipswich House, Inc. and Alexander Wolf & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv07076
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case has been assigned to the undersigned Magistrate Judge pursuant to the Court's Direct Assignment Pilot Program, which is governed by Administrative Order 2023-23. https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/general-ordes/AdminOrder2023-23.pdf. The Administrative Order answers to Frequently Asked Questions about the Pilot Program. An initial conference will be held at 12:00 p.m. on January 8, 2024 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. The attached Discovery Plan worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by January 4, 2024. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/20/2023. (LV)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Chancellor, A.)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Alexander Wolf & Company, Inc. answer due 12/1/2023; Ipswich House, Inc. answer due 12/1/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/2/2023. (LV)
November 1, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ipswich House, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Chancellor, A.)
October 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by A. G. Chancellor, III on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Chancellor, A.)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Zapata, Edward Vincent Hommel. Alexander Wolf & Company, Inc. served on 10/2/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Zapata, Fausto)
October 11, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Zapata, Edward Vincent Hommel. Ipswich House, Inc. served on 10/2/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Zapata, Fausto)
September 26, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alexander Wolf & Company, Inc.. (GO)
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ipswich House, Inc.. (GO)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Edward Vincent Hommel, Maria Zapata (Zapata, Fausto)
September 26, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Edward Vincent Hommel, Maria Zapata (Zapata, Fausto)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (NEF regenerated for statistical purposes)(LF)
September 25, 2023 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
September 25, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
September 25, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: You can put both addresses for each defendant on one summons. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
September 22, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, by Edward Vincent Hommel, Maria Zapata (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Zapata, Fausto)
September 22, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Edward Vincent Hommel, Maria Zapata (Zapata, Fausto)
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Wolf & Company, Inc., Ipswich House, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17112600 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Maria Zapata, Edward Vincent Hommel. (Zapata, Fausto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapata et al v. Ipswich House, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zapata
Represented By: Fausto E. Zapata, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Vincent Hommel
Represented By: Fausto E. Zapata, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipswich House, Inc.
Represented By: A. G. Chancellor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Wolf & Company, Inc.
Represented By: A. G. Chancellor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?