United States of America v. Larcher-Muhr
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thi Larcher-Muhr and Thi Hong Bui
Case Number: 2:2023cv07476
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 5221 Foreign Bank Account Penalties
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This case is hereby dismissed, the parties are to bear their respective costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of litigation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/6/2023. (DF)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed on December 4, 2023 at ECF No. #16 , the Initial Conference scheduled for December 6, 2023 at 10:30 AM is hereby cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/5/2023. (DF)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Lieb, Samantha)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will be held on December 6, 2023 at 10:30 AM via the Court's Video Zoom. The Court will email the Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed 26(f) Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than November 29, 2023. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. This conference is a public proceeding, and all are welcome to attend via telephone or via video. If you would like to receive the Zoom invitation, please contact Judge Wicks' Courtroom Deputy at (631) 712-5625. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. Counsel for all parties are directed to review Docket Entry No. #6 , concerning the assignment of a Magistrate Judge to oversee this case. If by January 6, 2024 all parties have not signed and filed the consent form consenting to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge, the Clerk of Court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge to the case. In that event, the assigned Magistrate Judge will remain on the case and preside over all non-dispositive pretrial matters unless the assigned District Judge orders otherwise. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Rule 26(f) Scheduling Order, #2 JMW Individual Practice Rules) (DF)
October 30, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF PRE-JUDGMENT LEVY OF ATTACHMENT. (GO)
October 30, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thi Larcher-Muhr. (Katz, Neil)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECREE of Forfeiture and Order of Delivery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 10/25/2023. (DF)
October 10, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment and Sequestration (expedited) (ECF No. 5) served on Thi Larcher-Muhr on 10/7/2023, filed by United States of America. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment and Sequestration (expedited) (ECF No. 5) served on James S. Muhr on 10/7/2023, filed by United States of America. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Thi Larcher-Muhr served on 10/7/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. (Lieb, Samantha)
October 10, 2023 NOTICE: This case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to the Court's Direct Assignment Pilot Program, which is governed by Administrative Order 2023-23. The Administrative Order, answers to Frequently Asked Questions about the Pilot Program, information about consenting to a Magistrate Judge, and a biography of the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case are on the Courts website: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (DF)
October 6, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Thi Larcher-Muhr. (LJ)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (LJ)
October 6, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
October 5, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment and Sequestration (expedited) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Hyland, #2 Declaration of Maschil Powell, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Writ of Attachment, #5 Clerk's Notice of Pre-Judgment Levy of Attachment) (Lieb, Samantha)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by United States of America (Lieb, Samantha)
October 5, 2023 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/6/2023) (LJ).
October 5, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Lieb on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Lieb, Samantha)
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thi Larcher-Muhr Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Glen, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Larcher-Muhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thi Larcher-Muhr
Represented By: Neil David Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thi Hong Bui
Represented By: Neil David Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samantha Lieb
Represented By: Julia Glen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?