Beck v. Metropolitan Bank Holding Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly V. Beck
Defendant: Metropolitan Bank Holding Corp. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2023cv07564
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Gippetti on behalf of Kimberly V. Beck (notification declined or already on case) (Gippetti, Michael)
December 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter by Kimberly V. Beck (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Admission for EDNY) (Gippetti, Michael)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter Serving Copies of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Moving Papers by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Kandel, Tyler)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court Letter to Judge Choudhury Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Watson, Lauren)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kimberly V. Beck. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and MOL in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Gippetti, Michael)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court has reviewed defendants' correspondence concerning defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss and request for a pre-motion conference and finds that a conference is not necessary at this time. The request for a pre-motion conference is thereby DENIED. Defendants shall serve plaintiff with any motion to dismiss the Complaint by December 8, 2023 and plaintiff shall serve defendant with any brief in opposition or amended complaint by January 12, 2024. Defendants shall serve plaintiff with any reply to plaintiffs' brief in opposition by January 26, 2024. The parties must consult and comply with the Court's Individual Rules, including the Court's recommended bundling practice. See Individual Rule 5.2.6. Consequently, all briefing shall be filed with the court no later than January 26, 2024. The parties must consult and comply with the Courts Individual Rules concerning the provision of any courtesy copy to chambers after the motion is fully briefed. Should the plaintiff choose to amend, defendants shall file a letter requesting a pre-motion conference in advance of filing any motion dismiss in accordance with this Court's Individual Rule 5.1. Ordered by Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury on 11/3/2023. (NB)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) which requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs. Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d)(3). (RC)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD Received: Supreme Court State of New York, Suffolk County, 616101/2023: Containing Notice of Removal. (AMF)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for pre motion conference by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Wire Transfer Agreement, #3 Exhibit C, Wire Transfer Agreement) (Watson, Lauren)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (RC)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (LJ)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Christina Watson on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Watson, Lauren)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Kandel, Tyler)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 616101/2023. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-17169921) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Combined pleadings and filings, #2 Exhibit B. Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C. FDIC Information, #4 Exhibit D. Articles of Association) (Kandel, Tyler) Modified on 10/11/2023 (LJ).
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Nusrat Jahan Choudhury and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Michael P. Gippetti - This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (LJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Metropolitan Bank Holding Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly V. Beck
Represented By: Michael P. Gippetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Bank Holding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lauren Christina Watson
Represented By: Tyler Jay Kandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?