Belov et al v. Northwell Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anatoli Belov, Irina Belov and Eryn Kaplan
Defendant: Northwell Health, Inc. and Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv08583
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER re #12 : The application is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/2/2024. c/ecf (RI)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 First MOTION to Stay the action by Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.. (Maxwell, Joel)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay for all further proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 12/20/2023. (GO)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Flynn on behalf of Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Flynn, Ashley)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Adam Nirenberg on behalf of Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Nirenberg, Seth)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Michael Maxwell on behalf of Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Maxwell, Joel)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in civil action 23cv9011(AYS) indicates this is a related case. (LJ)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anatoli Belov, Eryn Kaplan, Irina Belov. Northwell Health, Inc. waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Bilsborrow, James)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: An IN-PERSON Initial Conference is set for 3/6/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 11/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 AYS RULES) (JT)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Northwell Health, Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Northwell) (TLH)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CL)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
November 20, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
November 20, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The full case caption must appear on the summons., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northwell Health, Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17299168 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Anatoli Belov, Eryn Kaplan, Irina Belov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit A) (Bilsborrow, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belov et al v. Northwell Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anatoli Belov
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Belov
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eryn Kaplan
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwell Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Michael Maxwell
Represented By: Ashley Flynn
Represented By: Seth Adam Nirenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?